Domesick v. JD E-Commerce America Limited et al
Plaintiff: Michael Domesick
Defendant: JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc., Additional Defendants, New Shining Image LLC, Weichang Zhang of Wenchang Liuzuohu Shangmao Youxiangongsi LTD, Centune Toon, Inc., Htpoil Holding Trade Co., Ltd, LI MA, Jaybally, Inc, Keslen LLC, NSI Deals, Street Corner Co., LTD, Inno Products Mall, Inc and Wenchang Liuzuohu Shangmao Youxiangongsi
Case Number: 3:2023cv00590
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Mike Margolis on behalf of JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc. (Margolis, Mike)
September 7, 2023 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell T. Wong on behalf of JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc. (Wong, Russell)
September 7, 2023 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Ping Zhang on behalf of JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc. (Zhang, Ping)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: A pre-settlement conference call is scheduled for 3:00 PM on 9/12/2023 with Judge Richardson. Conference call instructions have been provided to counsel via email. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 9/6/2023. (Fries, J.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 71 AMENDED NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. RESET FROM 10-4-2023. Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the Rule 16(b) teleconference is now set for 10-5-2023 at 2:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Please dial 860-506-1344 and enter 683 368 053# as the conference ID number to participate. (Shafer, J.)
August 25, 2023 Filing 70 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Centune Toon Inc, HTPOIL HOLDING TRADE CO., LTD, INNO PRODUCTS MALL INC., JAYBALLY INC, and Li Ma by Michael Domesick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Li Ma Address, #2 Exhibit B - Colorado Entity Addresses, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Mailing, #4 Exhibit D - Text of Proposed Order)(Domesick, Michael)
August 24, 2023 Filing 69 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying court orders and motions per Doc. 11 served on Li Ma on July 3, 2023, filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING DKT. 62 in light of the recent changes to the District of Connecticut's Local Rules, removing the obligation for local counsel to have an office within the District. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Attorneys Ping Zhang, Mike Margolis, and Russell T. Wong motions to be admitted pro hac vice. See Dkts. #59 , #60 , and #61 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/23/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
August 23, 2023 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying court orders and motions per Doc. 11 served on Li Ma on July 3, 2023, filed by Michael Domesick., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Domesick. LI MA served on 7/3/2023, answer due 7/24/2023. (Domesick, Michael)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for all settlement purposes. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8-21-2023. (Shafer, J.)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER referring this case to a magistrate judge for settlement purposes pursuant to the parties' request in the Joint 26(f) Report, Dkt. #63 . The Clerk is directed to refer this case to a magistrate judge for a settlement conference. The parties are directed to jointly contact the assigned judge's chambers to schedule the conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/21/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SCHEDULING ORDER. After reviewing the parties Joint 26(f) Report, Dkt. #63 , the Court sets the following case management deadlines and approves the proposed internal deadlines. The parties shall file their joint disputed claim construction chart by 01/09/2024, opening Markman briefs by 02/13/2024, and responsive Markman briefs by 03/19/2024. After reviewing the briefing, the Court will schedule a Markman Hearing and issue a claim construction ruling permitting the parties sufficient time to complete discovery by the discovery deadline. A discovery status teleconference will take place on 04/10/2024 at 4:00 pm. All discovery, including but not limited to depositions of expert witnesses, shall be completed by 07/08/2024. Dispositive motions are due by 08/08/2024. If no dispositive motions are filed, the joint trial memorandum ("JTM") is due by 09/09/2024, and jury selection will take place on 11/19/2024 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. If dispositive motions are filed, the JTM is due by 05/08/2025, and jury selection will take place on 07/15/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month that the jury trial is scheduled to take place and the following month. The parties are directed to closely follow Chambers' Practices #8 -- including the deadlines and format of filings -- when completing and filing the JTM, which shall be accompanied by the voir dire questions, jury instructions, and motions in limine. All evidentiary objections raised in the JTM must be the subject of a motion in limine and supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. The parties' exhibit binders and electronic exhibits, as well as any courtroom technology requests, must be submitted no later than 2 weeks before jury selection. The Court also requests that any courtesy copies sent to Chambers be printed from the docket and contain the header of the Court's electronic filing system. If and/or when the parties feel that a settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge would be productive, the parties may jointly request such on the docket.Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/21/2024.(Lee, Elisabeth)
August 18, 2023 Filing 63 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - VLB Standing Order in Patent Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - N.D.Cal Patent Local Rules 11-2020)(Levi, Alina)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 VACATED AT DKT. 68 -- ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ping Zhang to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, #60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mike Margolis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice, and #61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Russell T. Wong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. These motions fail to satisfy D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83, because the sponsoring attorney does not appear to have a local office within the District of Connecticut. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83(c). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/18/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth) Vacated on 8-23-2023 (Shafer, J.).
August 16, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Russell T. Wong to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7451880) by JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Levi, Alina)
August 15, 2023 Filing 60 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mike Margolis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7450238) by JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Levi, Alina)
August 15, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ping Zhang to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7450205) by JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Levi, Alina)
August 15, 2023 Answer deadline updated for JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, and Walmart, Inc. to 9-25-2023 per Dkt. 58 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/25/2023 To Respond to Second Amended Complaint #54 Amended Complaint and granting #57 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/25/2023 To Respond to Second Amended Complaint #54 Amended Complaint for good cause shown and on consent by Plaintiff. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/14/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
August 14, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/25/2023 To Respond to Second Amended Complaint #54 Amended Complaint,, by JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation. (Levi, Alina)
August 14, 2023 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/25/2023 To Respond to Second Amended Complaint #54 Amended Complaint,, by Walmart, Inc.. (Levi, Alina)
August 11, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Rule 16(b) teleconference set for 10-4-2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Please dial 860-506-1344 and enter 683 368 053# as the conference ID number to participate. (Shafer, J.)
August 10, 2023 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Domesick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Patents-in-Suit, #2 Exhibit Infringing Devices per Claim 19 of U.S. Patent No. 10,286,245, #3 Exhibit Infringing Devices per Claim 16 of U.S. Patent No. 10,286,245, #4 Exhibit Infringing Devices per Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 11,491,364, #5 Exhibit Infringing Devices per 10 of U.S. Patent No. 11,491,364, #6 Exhibit Infringing Devices/Methods per Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 9,895,573, #7 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Domesick, Michael)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: In light of the forthcoming 26(f) report and in view of the pro se Plaintiff and multiple Defendants, the Court schedules a Rule 16(b) conference to be held on October 4, 2023 at 10:00 AM to ensure this case will be properly and efficiently managed from the outset. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/09/2023.(Lee, Elisabeth)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #38 MOTION to Deem Service Effective and denying #40 MOTION to Deem Service Effective on Defendant IAO Tech (aka Iaobao Limited) . Plaintiff has not cited a federal rule or statute that authorizes the relief he seeks, i.e., an advisory opinion about the effectiveness of his service. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m), "If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court -- on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff -- must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time." No motion has been made and the Court has issued no such order as to Defendants Centune Toon Inc., Htpoil Holding Trade Co., Ltd, Li Ma, and Jaybally, Inc. With respect to Defendant Weichang Zhang of Wenchang Liuzuohu Shangmao Youxiangongsi LTD, Plaintiff shall effectuate proper service on or before 11/06/2023 or the case will be dismissed without prejudice unless Plaintiff can show good cause as to why service should not be extended. If Plaintiff believes he properly served an opponent and the opponent has not filed an answer or otherwise responded to the complaint pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 and 12, his recourse is to file a motion for default under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/08/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
August 8, 2023 Set deadline: Second Amended Complaint due by 8-14-2023 per Dkt. 48 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 8, 2023 Set deadline: service as to Weichang Zhang of Wenchang Liuzuohu Shangmao Youxiangongsi LTD due by 11-6-2023 per Dkt. 52 Order. (Shafer, J.)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER as to all parties: Defendants' recent filings fail to comply with the Court's Electronic Filing Preferences outlined at Dkt. 8. As the Court instructed Plaintiff at Dkt. 27, all parties shall review (1) all Standing Orders and Chambers Practices on this docket, see, e.g., Dkts. 6-11; (2) this Court's Pretrial Preferences available at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/content/vanessa-l-bryant; (3) this District's Local Rules available at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders; and (4) the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure available at same. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 23-cv-590. (Lee, Elisabeth)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER finding as moot #44 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 5, 2023 to Respond to Amended Complaint #21 Amended Complaint and finding as moot #46 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 30, 2023 to Respond to Amended First Amended Complaint #34 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint as Plaintiff has been granted leave to amend his First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/07/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Joint MOTION for Stipulated Order of Injunction and Dismissal Order. See attached Order of Injunction and Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to dismiss Defendant Kelsen LLC from this case pursuant to the attached. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/07/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #34 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint as defense counsel's Motions for Extension of Time, Dkts. #44 and #46 indicate the served defendants do not object. Furthermore, the proposed amendments cure errors and add a claim against a defendant who has been served and did not indicate an intention to oppose the motion in its most recent motion for extension of time. At this early stage in litigation and in light of Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court finds good cause for Plaintiff to amend the complaint. Plaintiff shall file his proposed amended complaint with the title, Second Amended Complaint, on or before 08/14/2023. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 08/07/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth) Modified on 8/7/2023 to correct typo (Bozek, M.).
August 7, 2023 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Stipulated Order of Injunction and Dismissal Order by Michael Domesick. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Domesick, Michael)
August 7, 2023 Docket Entry Correction re 48 Order. Modified docket text to correct typo. The correct Federal Rule referenced in the order is Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and not Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a)(2). (Bozek, M.)
August 4, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 30, 2023 to Respond to Amended First Amended Complaint #34 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint by JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited. (Levi, Alina)
August 4, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Alina Levi on behalf of JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited (Levi, Alina)
August 4, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 5, 2023 to Respond to Amended Complaint #21 Amended Complaint by Walmart, Inc.. (Levi, Alina)
August 2, 2023 Docket Entry Correction re #42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed: waiver sent on 7-31-2023, answer due 10-29-2023. (Shafer, J.)
August 2, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Rama Kesani for Keslen LLC (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Gaskins, A)
August 2, 2023 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited waiver sent on 7-31-2023, answer due 10-29-2023 filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael) Modified to correct dates on 9-5-2023 (Shafer, J.).
August 2, 2023 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying court orders and motions per Doc. 11 served on Li Ma on July 22, 2023, filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
August 2, 2023 Filing 40 MOTION to Deem Service Effective on Defendant IAO Tech (aka Iaobao Limited) by Michael Domesick.Responses due by 8/23/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit IAO Tech (aka Iaobao Limited) Poof of Service, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Domesick, Michael)
August 2, 2023 Filing 39 NOTICE by Michael Domesick regarding Overseas Service (Domesick, Michael)
July 31, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Deem Service Effective by Michael Domesick.Responses due by 8/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavits of Due Diligence, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael H. Domesick, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Domesick, Michael)
July 28, 2023 Reset deadline: Rule 26(f) meeting report is now due by 8-18-2023 per Dkt. 37 Order. (Shafer, J.)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/18/2023for Local Rule 26(f) conference and report 35 Notice,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, for good cause shown. The parties are ordered to meet and confer pursuant to Local Rule 26(f) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). To the extent Defendant Walmart, Inc. fails to communicate with Plaintiff regarding court orders, continued failure may result in default entry for failure to defend. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/27/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
July 27, 2023 Filing 36 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/18/2023for Local Rule 26(f) conference and report 35 Notice,,,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, by Michael Domesick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Emails to Blank Rome LLP, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Domesick, Michael)
July 25, 2023 Filing 35 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within thirty days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within fourteen days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty-four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties must file on or before 8-8-2023: (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a form 26(f) report; or (2) a form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Clerk on 7-25-2023. (Shafer, J.)
July 24, 2023 Filing 34 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 Amended Complaint First Amended Complaint by Michael Domesick.Responses due by 8/14/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed new Count XIV against Walmart, Inc., #2 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Domesick, Michael)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #24 Joint MOTION for Stipulated Order of Injunction and Dismissal Order. See attached Order of Injunction and Dismissal. The Clerk is directed to dismiss Defendant New Shining Image, LLC from this case pursuant to the attached. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/24/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
July 21, 2023 Filing 32 RESPONSE filed by New Shining Image LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appearance and confirmation of motion)(Ziegler, Geza)
July 20, 2023 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying court orders and motions per Doc. 11 served on Keslen LLC on July 3, 2023, filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
July 20, 2023 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying court orders and motions per Doc. 11 served on JD.COM AMERICAN TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION on July 14, 2023, filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
July 20, 2023 Filing 29 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying court orders and motions per Doc. 11 served on JD E-COMMERCE AMERICA LIMITED on July 14, 2023, filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
July 20, 2023 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and accompanying court orders and motions per Doc. 11 served on Jennifer Pappas on July 14, 2023, filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying without prejudice to refiling #25 First MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint . The Court informs Plaintiff that the motion fails to comply with this Court's Electronic Filing Preferences outlined at Dkt. 8. The Court instructs Plaintiff to review (1) all Standing Orders and Chambers Practices on this docket, see, e.g., Dkts. 6-11; (2) this Court's Pretrial Preferences available at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/content/vanessa-l-bryant; (3) this District's Local Rules available at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/court-info/local-rules-and-orders; and (4) the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure available at same. With respect to the instant motion, both the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure set forth specific procedural requirements for seeking leave to amend. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(f) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 15. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/18/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Pro Se Plaintiff has filed a Joint Motion for Stipulated Order of Injunction and Dismissal, which he purports reflects a settlement between Defendant New Shining Image, LLC and him. Before addressing this motion, the Court orders counsel for Defendant New Shining Image, LLC to enter a notice of appearance and indicate whether the client agrees to the proposed order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 07/18/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
July 18, 2023 Filing 25 First MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Michael Domesick.Responses due by 8/8/2023 (Domesick, Michael)
July 17, 2023 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Stipulated Order of Injunction and Dismissal Order by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
July 10, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Walmart, Inc. to 8-14-2023 per Dkt. 23 Order. (Shafer, J.)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 #22 Motions for Extension of Time. Defendant-Walmart's deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 8/14/2023. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/10/2023. (Burlingham, Corinne)
July 7, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2023, respectfully submitted via letter, to answer or move with respect to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #21 Amended Complaint by Walmart, Inc.. (Levi, Alina)
June 29, 2023 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Additional Defendants, JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc., filed by Michael Domesick.(Domesick, Michael)
June 28, 2023 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14, 2023 to Respond to plaintiff's complaint #1 Complaint, by Walmart, Inc.. (Levi, Alina)
June 21, 2023 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Additional Defendants, JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days.*Michael Domesick* *98 Brighton St.* *New Britain, CT 06053*. (Gaskins, A.)
June 19, 2023 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Additional Defendants waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/15/2023 filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
June 16, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Walmart, Inc. waiver sent on 5/15/2023, answer due 6/15/2023 filed by Michael Domesick. (Domesick, Michael)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Walmart, Inc.'s deadline to respond is extended to July 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/9/2023. (Burlingham, Corinne)
June 9, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Walmart, Inc. to 7-14-2023 per Dkt. 16 Order. (Shafer, J.)
June 7, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement , per FRCP 7.1, by Walmart, Inc.. (Levi, Alina)
June 7, 2023 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until July 14, 2023 to answer or move re the complaint #1 Complaint, by Walmart, Inc.. (Levi, Alina)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE ATTACHED JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5-8-2023. (Shafer, J.)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 MOTION By Self-Represented Litigant To Participate In Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 05/08/2023. (Lee, Elisabeth)
May 5, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 MOTION for filed by Michael Domesick, #1 Complaint, filed by Michael Domesick, #10 Report on Patent/Trademark Form, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Consent to Electronic Notice filed by Michael Domesick, #7 Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #9 Order, Filing Fee Received Signed by Clerk on 5/5/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 5, 2023 Filing 10 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Gaskins, A.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON PATENT CASES. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/4/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/4/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/4/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/4/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2023 Discovery due by 11/3/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2023 Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 4, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2023. (Mendez, D)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION By Self-Represented Litigant To Participate In Electronic Filing, by Michael Domesick. (Mendez, D)
May 4, 2023 Filing 2 Consent to Electronic Notice By Self-Represented Litigant, by Michael Domesick. (Mendez, D)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Defendants, JD E-Commerce America Limited, JD.Com American Technologies Corporation, JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited, Walmart, Inc., filed by Michael Domesick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3) (Mendez, D)
May 4, 2023 Filing fee received from Michael Domesick: $ 402.00, HFD receipt number 20179. (Mendez, D)
May 4, 2023 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Shafer, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Domesick v. JD E-Commerce America Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Domesick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD E-Commerce America Limited
Represented By: Alina Levi
Represented By: Russell T. Wong
Represented By: Mike Margolis
Represented By: Ping Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD.Com American Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Alina Levi
Represented By: Russell T. Wong
Represented By: Mike Margolis
Represented By: Ping Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JingDong E-Commerce (Trade) Hong Kong Corporation Limited
Represented By: Alina Levi
Represented By: Russell T. Wong
Represented By: Mike Margolis
Represented By: Ping Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Alina Levi
Represented By: Russell T. Wong
Represented By: Mike Margolis
Represented By: Ping Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Shining Image LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weichang Zhang of Wenchang Liuzuohu Shangmao Youxiangongsi LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centune Toon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Htpoil Holding Trade Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LI MA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaybally, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keslen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSI Deals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Street Corner Co., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inno Products Mall, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenchang Liuzuohu Shangmao Youxiangongsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?