Rougeau v. Aetna Inc.
Plaintiff: Cindy Rougeau, David Mueller, Jeanne Peffley-Wilson, Mark Brewer, Nigel Keep, Vincentina Luciano, Gordon Titcomb and John Vogel
Defendant: Aetna Inc. and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Consolidated Plaintiff: Donna Vogel, Beverly Banks, Angela Brodrick, Tracy Bussell, Randall Carter, James Craig, John Davis, Denise Emery, Brenda Gilpatrick, William S. Henry, Kimberly Hoffman, Roger Jackson, Pamela Lazaroff, Stephen Lazaroff, Nancy Paterson, Roberta Platt, Michelle Ronne, Kevin Stone, Roderick Veazey, Nicolas Venezia, Valarie Venezia, Cynthia Whites, Richard Xavar, S. W., A. T., T. E., Robert Lizotte, Jessica Guerrero, Eileen Clancy, Edward Wilczynski, Jefferey King and Lenore Caliendo
Consolidated Defendant: Aetna International, LLC, Aetna Health Management, Inc., Aetna Health, Inc., Aetna Corporate Services, LLC, Aetna Resources, LLC, NationsBenefits, LLC and NationsBenefits Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00635
Filed: May 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Kari A Dooley
2 Judge: Thomas O Farrish
3 Judge: Vernon D Oliver
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION for Kristine McAlister Brown, Donald MacKaye Houser, Daniella Patricia Main, Gavin Reinke, Theodore J. Tucci, Wystan M. Ackerman, Jenna M. Scoville to Withdraw as Attorney by Aetna Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Tucci, Theodore)
November 21, 2023 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J Zakrzewski on behalf of Aetna Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company (Zakrzewski, Steven)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting Motion to Stay Deadline to Answer #76 . The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is stayed until the United States Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation (JPML) rules on a pending motion to transfer proceedings. Should the JPML deny the motion, Defendants will have thirty (30) days to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 11/14/2023. (Rogers, Da'Shaun)
November 10, 2023 Filing 76 MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadline to Answer by Aetna Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company.Responses due by 12/1/2023 (Tucci, Theodore)
November 7, 2023 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference. Held on August 16, 2023 before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Court Reporter: Tracy Gow. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/28/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2024. (Gow, T.)
October 30, 2023 Filing 74 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Comite, Erin)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vernon D. Oliver for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2023.(Hushin, Z.)
October 11, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cleemann on behalf of Beverly Banks, Mark Brewer, Randall Carter, Nigel Keep, Vincentina Luciano, David Mueller, Jeanne Peffley-Wilson, Roberta Platt, Michelle Ronne, Cindy Rougeau, Gordon Titcomb, Roderick Veazey, Nicolas Venezia, Valarie Venezia, Donna Vogel, John Vogel (Cleemann, Joseph)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph G. Cleemann. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
October 10, 2023 Filing 70 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph G. Cleemann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7509096) by Beverly Banks, Mark Brewer, Randall Carter, Nigel Keep, Vincentina Luciano, David Mueller, Jeanne Peffley-Wilson, Roberta Platt, Michelle Ronne, Cindy Rougeau, Gordon Titcomb, Roderick Veazey, Nicolas Venezia, Valarie Venezia, Donna Vogel, John Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Comite, Erin)
September 28, 2023 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 9/22/2023, answer due 11/21/2023 filed by Beverly Banks; Mark Brewer; Randall Carter; Nigel Keep; Vincentina Luciano; David Mueller; Jeanne Peffley-Wilson; Roberta Platt; Michelle Ronne; Cindy Rougeau; Gordon Titcomb; Roderick Veazey; Nicolas Venezia; Valarie Venezia; Donna Vogel; John Vogel. (Comite, Erin)
September 21, 2023 Filing 68 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aetna Life Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erin Green Comite* *Scott & Scott LLP - CT* *156 South Main Street, P. O. Box 192* *Colchester, CT 06415*. (Fanelle, N.)
September 20, 2023 Filing 67 Disclosure Statement as per Rule 7.1(a)(2) by Beverly Banks, Mark Brewer, Randall Carter, Nigel Keep, Vincentina Luciano, David Mueller, Jeanne Peffley-Wilson, Roberta Platt, Michelle Ronne, Cindy Rougeau, Gordon Titcomb, Roderick Veazey, Nicolas Venezia, Valarie Venezia, Donna Vogel, John Vogel. (Comite, Erin)
September 20, 2023 Filing 66 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Aetna Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed by Michelle Ronne, Cindy Rougeau, Donna Vogel, Roberta Platt, Randall Carter, Roderick Veazey, Valarie Venezia, Nicolas Venezia, Beverly Banks, David Mueller, Jeanne Peffley-Wilson, Mark Brewer, Nigel Keep, Vincentina Luciano, Gordon Titcomb, John Vogel.(Comite, Erin)
September 20, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Comite, Erin)
August 24, 2023 Set Deadlines: Master Consolidated Pleadings due by 9/20/2023; Motion to Dismiss due by 11/20/2023; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2023. (Gould, K.)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' master consolidated complaint is due by September 20, 2023. Defendant's motion to dismiss is due by November 20, 2023. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss by December 22, 2023 . Defendant shall file any reply in support of the motion to dismiss by January 26, 2024. The parties shall file a Rule 26(f) Report by October 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/24/2023. (Bernard, Hannah) Modified on 8/24/2023 (Gould, K.).
August 23, 2023 Filing 64 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/20/2023 to file a Master Consolidated Complaint by Beverly Banks, Angela Brodrick, Tracy Bussell, Lenore Caliendo, Randall Carter, Eileen Clancy, James Craig, John Davis, T. E., Denise Emery, Brenda Gilpatrick, William S. Henry, Kimberly Hoffman, Roger Jackson, Jefferey King, Pamela Lazaroff, Stephen Lazaroff, Robert Lizotte, Nancy Paterson, Roberta Platt, Michelle Ronne, Cindy Rougeau, Kevin Stone, A. T., Roderick Veazey, Nicolas Venezia, Valarie Venezia, Donna Vogel, S. W., Cynthia Whites, Edward Wilczynski, Richard Xavar. (Comite, Erin)
August 22, 2023 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:23-cv-00740, 3:23-cv-00779, 3:23-cv-00873, 3:23-cv-00906, 3:23-cv-00910, 3:23-cv-00912 by Jefferey King. (Schubert, Robert)
August 22, 2023 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:23-cv-00740, 3:23-cv-00779, 3:23-cv-00873, 3:23-cv-00906, 3:23-cv-00910, 3:23-cv-00912 by Jefferey King. (Schubert, Amber)
August 17, 2023 Filing 60 First Disclosure Statement by Jefferey King. (Schubert, Amber)
August 17, 2023 Filing 59 Notice of Consolidation. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
August 16, 2023 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/16/2023. 29 minutes(Court Reporter Tracy Gow.) (Gould, K.)
August 16, 2023 Reset Deadlines: Consolidated Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2023; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/29/2023. (Gould, K.)
August 9, 2023 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:23-cv-00740, 3:23-cv-00779, 3:23-cv-00873, 3:23-cv-00906, 3:23-cv-00910, 3:23-cv-00912 by Edward Wilczynski. (Alperstein, Jason)
August 8, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin Reinke on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Reinke, Gavin)
August 7, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen M Brady on behalf of T. E., A. T., S. W. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Brady, Maureen)
August 7, 2023 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey H. Taylor on behalf of Eileen Clancy (Taylor, Lindsey)
August 7, 2023 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lindsey H. Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7438491) by Eileen Clancy. (Taylor, Lindsey)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lindsey H. Taylor. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/6/2023. Signed by Clerk on 8/7/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
August 4, 2023 Filing 52 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lindsey H. Taylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7438491) by Eileen Clancy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lindsey H. Taylor)(Comite, Erin)
August 4, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jessica Zinns on behalf of T. E., A. T., S. W. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Zinns, Sharon)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting on consent #44 Motion to Stay. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is STAYED. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/3/2023. (Bernard, Hannah)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gavin Reinke. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Maureen M. Brady ; granting #47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sharon J. Zinns. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/2/2023. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
August 2, 2023 Filing 47 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sharon J. Zinns to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7435712) by T. E., A. T., S. W.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sharon J. Zinns)(Comite, Erin)
August 2, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney(s) Maureen M. Brady to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7435098) by T. E., A. T., S. W.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Maureen M. Brady)(Comite, Erin)
August 1, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for August 16, 2023 at 2:00PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. (Bernard, Hannah)Conference Line: 888-278-0296Access Code: 807-7899
July 31, 2023 Filing 44 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Aetna Inc..Responses due by 8/21/2023 (Tucci, Theodore)
July 31, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine McAlister Brown on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Brown, Kristine)
July 27, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Interim Co-Lead Counsel, Liaison Counsel, and Plaintiffs' Executive Committee Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)) by Beverly Banks, Angela Brodrick, Tracy Bussell, Randall Carter, James Craig, John Davis, Denise Emery, Brenda Gilpatrick, William S. Henry, Kimberly Hoffman, Roger Jackson, Pamela Lazaroff, Stephen Lazaroff, Robert Lizotte, Nancy Paterson, Roberta Platt, Michelle Ronne, Kevin Stone, Roderick Veazey, Nicolas Venezia, Valarie Venezia, Cynthia Whites, Edward Wilczynski, Richard Xavar. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Erin Green Comite in Support, #10 Proposed Order)(Comite, Erin)
July 26, 2023 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #26 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:23-cv-00740, 3:23-cv-00779, 3:23-cv-00873, 3:23-cv-00906, 3:23-cv-00910, 3:23-cv-00912 by Edward Wilczynski. (Cecchi, James)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/25/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
July 25, 2023 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/25/2023. Total Time: 12 minutes(Court Reporter Alicia Kyles.) (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 24, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald MacKaye Houser on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Houser, Donald)
July 24, 2023 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement by Eileen Clancy. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 24, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Davidson on behalf of Eileen Clancy (Davidson, Stuart)
July 24, 2023 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stuart A. Davidson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7422665) by Eileen Clancy. (Davidson, Stuart)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/22/2023. Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 24, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Gavin Reinke, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7423545) by Aetna Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Gavin Reinke, Esq., #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing Gavin Reinke, Esq.)(Tucci, Theodore)
July 24, 2023 Update Certificate of Good Standing Deadline for James E. Cecchi. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/19/2023. Pro Hac Vice motion from Member Case 23cv912. (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 21, 2023 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stuart A. Davidson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7422665) by Eileen Clancy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Stuart A. Davidson)(Comite, Erin)
July 21, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniella Patricia Main on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Main, Daniella)
July 20, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Consolidation Signed by Clerk on 7/20/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
July 20, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Status Conference set for 7/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert N. Chatigny. Please use the following dial in information for the call. Dial 866-434-5269, Access Code 8189198#. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/20/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
July 19, 2023 Filing 26 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:23-cv-00740, 3:23-cv-00779, 3:23-cv-00873, 3:23-cv-00906, 3:23-cv-00910, 3:23-cv-00912 by Aetna Inc..Responses due by 8/9/2023 (Tucci, Theodore)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 , #23 and #24 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 7/14/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 13, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniella P. Main to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7412230) by Aetna Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Tucci, Theodore)
July 13, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald M. Houser to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7412219) by Aetna Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Tucci, Theodore)
July 13, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kristine McAlister Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7412181) by Aetna Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Tucci, Theodore)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 , #18 and #19 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/10/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #8 , #9 and #10 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/10/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) John A. Yanchunis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Cindy Rougeau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Brian)
July 6, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marcio W. Valladares to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Cindy Rougeau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Brian)
July 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ra O. Amen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Cindy Rougeau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Brian)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 8/4/2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint and to 10/3/2023 to conduct the Rule 26(f) conference and file the parties Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 6/27/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Ackerman, Wystan)
June 27, 2023 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 4, 2023 Respond to Complaint by Aetna Inc.. (Tucci, Theodore)
June 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Scoville on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Scoville, Jenna)
June 27, 2023 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Aetna Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Inc.. (Tucci, Theodore)
June 27, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of Aetna Inc. (Tucci, Theodore)
June 27, 2023 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/3/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 27, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Aetna Inc. to 8/4/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
June 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ra O. Amen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7388774) by Cindy Rougeau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Brian)
June 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marcio W. Valladares to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7388761) by Cindy Rougeau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Brian)
June 21, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) John A. Yanchunis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7388752) by Cindy Rougeau. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Murray, Brian)
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aetna Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Brian P. Murray* *Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP* *230 Park Avenue Suite 358* * New York, NY 10169*. (Samson, Jessalyn)
May 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by Cindy Rougeau, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/16/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 5/16/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2023. Discovery due by 11/15/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2023. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
May 16, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
May 16, 2023 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
May 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7349044.), filed by Cindy Rougeau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, Brian)
May 16, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aetna Inc.. (Murray, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rougeau v. Aetna Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Rougeau
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mueller
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Peffley-Wilson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Brewer
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nigel Keep
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincentina Luciano
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Titcomb
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vogel
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Represented By: Jenna Scoville
Represented By: Daniella Patricia Main
Represented By: Donald MacKaye Houser
Represented By: Gavin Reinke
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Represented By: Steven J Zakrzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Steven J Zakrzewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Donna Vogel
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: John Kanca, IV
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Beverly Banks
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Angela Brodrick
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tracy Bussell
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Randall Carter
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James Craig
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Davis
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Denise Emery
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brenda Gilpatrick
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William S. Henry
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kimberly Hoffman
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roger Jackson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Pamela Lazaroff
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stephen Lazaroff
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nancy Paterson
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roberta Platt
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michelle Ronne
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kevin Stone
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roderick Veazey
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nicolas Venezia
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Valarie Venezia
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Cleemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cynthia Whites
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Xavar
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: S. W.
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Represented By: Maureen M Brady
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Sharon Jessica Zinns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: A. T.
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Maureen M Brady
Represented By: Sharon Jessica Zinns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: T. E.
Represented By: Brian P. Murray
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Maureen M Brady
Represented By: Sharon Jessica Zinns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert Lizotte
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jessica Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eileen Clancy
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Stuart A. Davidson
Represented By: Gregory M. Egleston
Represented By: Lindsey H. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Edward Wilczynski
Represented By: James E. Cecchi
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Jason Henry Alperstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jefferey King
Represented By: Amber Love Schubert
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Robert Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lenore Caliendo
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aetna International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aetna Health Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aetna Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aetna Corporate Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aetna Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: NationsBenefits, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: NationsBenefits Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?