Wilson Creek Energy, LLC v. Cushmore, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Wilson Creek Energy, LLC
Defendant: Frederick N. Cushmore, Jr. and FTC Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00697
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: A Settlement Conference is scheduled for September 13, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions regarding the conference. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 7/20/2023. (Santos, Sarah)
July 20, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers Room 306, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Maria E. Garcia. (Santos, Sarah)
July 20, 2023 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maria E. Garcia: Telephonic Pre-settlement Conference held on 7/20/2023. Total Time: 8 minutes (Santos, Sarah)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 Order Referring Case to a Magistrate Judge.The telephonic pre-settlement conference is rescheduled to Thursday, July 20, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Maria E. Garcia. Please call in to the Court's conference call line at 1-888-557-8511 and enter the pass code of 3852222# when prompted. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 7/18/23. (Cabral, Donald)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Telephonic pre-settlement conference set for July 25, 2023, at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Maria E. Garcia. Please call in to the Court's conference call line at 1-888-557-8511 and enter the pass code of 3852222#when prompted. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. Because the parties will likely be ordered to attend the conference, either in-person or via videoconference, counsel are instructed to obtain their client's schedules over the next ninety days and have them available during the pre-conference. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to aid in scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what, if any, information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference to maximize its chances of success. If either counsel has a firm, unavoidable conflict at the appointed date and time, e.g., a previously-scheduled appearance in another court, s/he should not file a motion for continuance on the docket but rather should call Chambers at 203-773-2022 as soon as possible with opposing counsel on the line to work out an alternate day and time for the pre-conference with Judge Garcia's law clerk. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 7/18/2023. (Santos, Sarah)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia to conduct a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7/14/2023.(Bozek, M.)
July 14, 2023 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A Pre-Settlement Conference was held on 7/14/2023. 3 minutes. (Salguero, Carlos)
July 10, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A telephonic pre-settlement Conference is set for 7/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend (in-person or by remote means) the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 30 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Salguero, Carlos)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 7/10/23.(Wood, R.)
July 10, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Prejudgment remedy hearing set for 10/5/2023 at 9:00 AM in East Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Thomas O. Farrish. (Wood, R.)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER RE: MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT REMEDY (ECF No.14). Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 7/10/23.(Wood, R.)
July 10, 2023 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas O. Farrish: Telephonic PJR Scheduling Conference held on 7/10/2023. Time 7 minutes(Court Reporter Court Smart.) (Wood, R.)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. A telephonic on-the-record prejudgment remedy scheduling conference is set for July 10, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Farrish. A schedule for completing briefing and for the PJR hearing will be set during the conference, and accordingly counsel should have available their own schedules and the schedules of any anticipated hearing witnesses. The parties may access the conference call line at 888-557-8511 and use pass code 4478772# when prompted. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 6/29/23.(Wood, R.)
June 28, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Hollander on behalf of Frederick N. Cushmore, Jr, FTC Partners, Inc. (Hollander, Adam)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish for a ruling on #14 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy and #15 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 6/23/2023.Motions referred to Thomas O. Farrish(Bozek, M.)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Sarala V. Nagala for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/21/23.(Pesta, J.)
June 16, 2023 Filing 16 RICO Case Statement by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC. (Cahill, Leslie)
June 12, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Disclosure of Assets by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC. (Cahill, Leslie)
June 12, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Leslie A. Cahill, #2 Text of Proposed Order For Hearing, #3 Notice and Claim Form, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cahill, Leslie)
June 2, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC. FTC Partners, Inc. served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. (Spears, Brian)
June 2, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC. Frederick N. Cushmore, Jr served on 6/2/2023, answer due 6/23/2023. (Spears, Brian)
June 1, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Affidavit by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wilson Creek Holdings, Inc. for Wilson Creek Energy, LLC. (Spears, Brian)
May 31, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Frederick N. Cushmore, Jr, FTC Partners, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leslie A. Cahill Spears Manning & Martini LLC* *2425 Post Road* *Suite 203* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Gaskins, A.) Corrected filed date on 6-1-2023 (Shafer, J.).
May 31, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC, #6 Protective Order, #2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie A. Cahill on behalf of Wilson Creek Energy, LLC (Cahill, Leslie)
May 31, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Frederick N. Cushmore, Jr, FTC Partners, Inc.. (Perez, J.)
May 30, 2023 Filing 10 CORRECTED Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2023.(Perez, J.)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/30/2023. (Gaskins, A.) Corrected filed date on 6-1-2023 (Shafer, J.).
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/30/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/30/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/29/2023 Discovery due by 11/29/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2024 Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
May 30, 2023 Filing 2 ENETERED IN ERROR: Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/30/2023.(Perez, J.) Modified on 5/31/2023. The complaint was mistakenly attached to this entry (Perez, J.).
May 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frederick N. Cushmore, Jr, FTC Partners, Inc., filed by Wilson Creek Energy, LLC.(Perez, J.)
May 30, 2023 Filing fee received from Leslie A. Cahill: $ 402.00, receipt number ACTDC-7363758 (Gaskins, A.)
May 30, 2023 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson Creek Energy, LLC v. Cushmore, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Creek Energy, LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Represented By: Leslie A. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick N. Cushmore, Jr.
Represented By: Adam Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTC Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?