Vogel v. Aetna, Inc
Plaintiff: Donna Vogel
Defendant: Aetna, Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv00740
Filed: June 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Kari A Dooley
2 Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER. For purposes of consolidation, this case is reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/24/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF TRANSFER: The Honorable Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer hereby transfers the above-identified case to the docket of THE HONORABLE Robert N. Chatigny for all purposes. All future pleadings and filings in this case shall bear docket number3:23CV740 (RNC). Pleadings or documents related to this action shall be filed with the Clerks Office in Hartford, Connecticut, where the docket is maintained. [See Local Rule 3(a).] Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/24/2023.(Lewis, D)
July 20, 2023 Cases associated. Create association to 3:23-cv-00635-RNC. (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 14, 2023 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule 7.1 by Donna Vogel. (Flick, Brian)
July 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Flick on behalf of Donna Vogel (Flick, Brian)
July 13, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of Donna Vogel (Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 13, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7410029) by Donna Vogel. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/11/2023. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/13/2023. (Lewis, D)
July 13, 2023 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian D. Flick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7400339) Signed By Brian D. Flick filed by Donna Vogel. (Kanca, John)
July 13, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/24/2023 (Lewis, D)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/10/2023. Signed by Clerk on 7/12/2023. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
July 11, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7410029) by Donna Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.)(Kanca, John)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Scoville on behalf of Aetna, Inc (Scoville, Jenna)
July 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Aetna, Inc (Ackerman, Wystan)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Aetna, Inc identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna, Inc. (Tucci, Theodore)
July 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of Aetna, Inc (Tucci, Theodore)
June 30, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Donna Vogel waiver sent on 6/30/2023, answer due 8/29/2023 filed by Donna Vogel. (Kanca, John)
June 30, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brian D. Flick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7400339) by Donna Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746(2))(Kanca, John)
June 9, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aetna, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Kanca, IV* *The Kanca Law Firm LLC* *40 Richards Avenue, Suite 353* *Norwalk, CT 06854*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 9, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Donna Vogel, #5 Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/7/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/7/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/6/2023 Discovery due by 12/7/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 1/11/2024 Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 7, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/7/2023.(Perez, J.)
June 7, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.)
June 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna, Inc ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7373598.), filed by Donna Vogel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kanca, John)
June 7, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aetna, Inc. (Kanca, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogel v. Aetna, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Vogel
Represented By: John Kanca, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr
Represented By: Brian D. Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna, Inc
Represented By: Jenna Scoville
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?