Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Oetiker Inc.
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co and Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Oetiker Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00768
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SGENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #15 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by July 31, 2024, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by August 30, 2024, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by September 30, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by August 30, 2024, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on April 26, 2024 at 3:15 p.m. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/2/2023.(Lewis, D)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint (Doc. #14 ), the Court DENIES defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. #11 ) without prejudice to the defendant's filing of a motion to dismiss, an answer, or other response to the amended complaint within 21 days of this order. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/2/2023. (Lewis, D)
July 28, 2023 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zielinski, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2023 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Oetiker Inc., filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Zielinski, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thaddeus Kirk on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Kirk, Thaddeus)
July 13, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Oetiker Inc. waiver sent on 7/6/2023, answer due 9/4/2023 filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Kirk, Thaddeus)
July 12, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/18/2023 (Lewis, D)
July 6, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Oetiker Inc..Responses due by 7/27/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bonin, Russell)
July 5, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Oetiker Inc.. (Bonin, Russell)
July 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Bonin on behalf of Oetiker Inc. (Bonin, Russell)
June 15, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Oetiker Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey M. Zielinski* *de Luca Levine LLC* *301 East Germantown Pike, 3rd Floor* *East Norriton, PA 19401*. (Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Disclosure Statement, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, #6 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/13/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/13/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2023 Discovery due by 12/13/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 1/17/2024 Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 13, 2023 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/13/23.(Hushin, Z.)
June 13, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
June 13, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Zielinski, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/14/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Cover sheet against Oetiker Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7380824.), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Zielinski, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/14/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
June 13, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Oetiker Inc.. (Zielinski, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Oetiker Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Ins Co
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Zielinski
Represented By: Thaddeus Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oetiker Inc.
Represented By: Russell Bonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?