Banks et al v. Aetna Inc
Plaintiff: BEVERLY BANKS, ANGELA BRODRICK, TRACEY BUSSELL, RANDALL CARTER, JAMES CRAIG, JOHN DAVIS, DENISE EMERY, BRENDA GILPATRICK, WILLIAM HENRY, KIMBERLY HOFFMAN, ROGER JACKSON, PAMELA LAZAROFF, STEPHEN LAZAROFF, NANCY PATERSON, ROBERT PLATT, MICHELLE RONNE, KEVIN STONE, RODERICK VEAZEY, NICHOLAS VENEZIA, VALARIE VENEZIA, CYNTHIA WHITES, RICHARD XAVER, Tracy Bussell, William S. Henry, Roberta Platt, Nicolas Venezia and Richard Xavar
Defendant: AETNA INC. and Aetna Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv00779
Filed: June 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER: For purposes of consolidation, this case is reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/24/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Chatigny for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 7/20/23. (Velez, F.)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The Honorable Judge Chatigny having granted a motion to consolidate this action with another case currently pending before him, see Rougeau v. Aetna, Inc., ECF No. 27, case no. 3:23-cv-635, and the plaintiffs in this action having consented to consolidation (per the consent motion filed in Rougeau, see id., ECF No. 26), the Clerk of Court hereby is asked, respectfully, to please transfer this action to Judge Chatigny for consolidation with case number 3:23-cv-635. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 7/20/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
July 20, 2023 Cases associated. Create association to 3:23-cv-00635-RNC. (Samson, Jessalyn)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. #14 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before August 28, 2023. The parties shall file their Local Rule 26(f) report on or before October 27, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 7/7/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
July 7, 2023 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants., Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/27/2023) (Wagner, Rebecca)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Omar A. Williams for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/29/2023.(Sichanh, Christina)
June 28, 2023 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 28, 2023 Respond to Complaint by Aetna Inc. (Tucci, Theodore)
June 28, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Scoville on behalf of Aetna Inc (Scoville, Jenna)
June 28, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Wystan M. Ackerman on behalf of Aetna Inc (Ackerman, Wystan)
June 28, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Aetna Inc identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for Aetna Inc. (Tucci, Theodore)
June 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of Aetna Inc (Tucci, Theodore)
June 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Green Comite on behalf of Beverly Banks, Angela Brodrick, Tracy Bussell, Randall Carter, James Craig, John Davis, Denise Emery, Brenda Gilpatrick, William S. Henry, Kimberly Hoffman, Roger Jackson, Pamela Lazaroff, Stephen Lazaroff, Nancy Paterson, Roberta Platt, Michelle Ronne, Kevin Stone, Roderick Veazey, Nicolas Venezia, Valarie Venezia, Cynthia Whites, Richard Xavar (Comite, Erin)
June 16, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aetna Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ian Wise Sloss* *Silver Golub & Teitell LLP* *One Landmark Square, 15th Floor* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Freberg, B)
June 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, filed by Nicolas Venezia, Roberta Platt, Randall Carter, Nancy Paterson, Kimberly Hoffman, Beverly Banks, Angela Brodrick, John Davis, Richard Xavar, Denise Emery, Stephen Lazaroff, Brenda Gilpatrick, Roderick Veazey, Roger Jackson, Pamela Lazaroff, William S. Henry, Cynthia Whites, Valarie Venezia, Kevin Stone, Tracy Bussell, Michelle Ronne, James Craig Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2023.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/15/2023.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/15/2023.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/15/2023.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2023; Discovery due by 12/15/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2024. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/2023.(Freberg, B)
June 15, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/15/2023.(Perez, J.)
June 15, 2023 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)
June 15, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA INC. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7383774.), filed by ROGER JACKSON, CYNTHIA WHITES, DENISE EMERY, KEVIN STONE, ANGELA BRODRICK, RICHARD XAVER, BEVERLY BANKS, RODERICK VEAZEY, MICHELLE RONNE, STEPHEN LAZAROFF, JOHN DAVIS, TRACEY BUSSELL, WILLIAM HENRY, PAMELA LAZAROFF, VALARIE VENEZIA, NANCY PATERSON, ROBERT PLATT, BRENDA GILPATRICK, RANDALL CARTER, NICHOLAS VENEZIA, KIMBERLY HOFFMAN, JAMES CRAIG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sloss, Ian)
June 15, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to AETNA INC.. (Sloss, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks et al v. Aetna Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY BANKS
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA BRODRICK
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY BUSSELL
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL CARTER
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CRAIG
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DAVIS
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE EMERY
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA GILPATRICK
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HENRY
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY HOFFMAN
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER JACKSON
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA LAZAROFF
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN LAZAROFF
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY PATERSON
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT PLATT
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE RONNE
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN STONE
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODERICK VEAZEY
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS VENEZIA
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALARIE VENEZIA
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA WHITES
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD XAVER
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Bussell
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William S. Henry
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Platt
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Venezia
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Xavar
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Represented By: Ian Wise Sloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc
Represented By: Jenna Scoville
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Wystan M. Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?