Levitan v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Jerald Levitan
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust and Walmart Claims Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00828
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
2 Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: A pre-settlement conference call with Judge Richardson is scheduled on 8/10/23 at 3:30 PM. Dial-in instructions for the call will be e-mailed to the parties. Signed by Judge Robert A. Richardson on 8/8/23. (Johnson, Alicia)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for settlement conference Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/8/2023.(Lewis, D)
August 7, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/9/2024 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007# (Lewis, D)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #18 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by November 7, 2024, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by December 9, 2024, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by January 9, 2025. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by December 30, 2024, or within 45 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on August 9, 2024 at 3:00 p.m.. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 8/7/2023.(Lewis, D)
August 4, 2023 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Springer, George)
July 12, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack G. Steigelfest on behalf of Jerald Levitan (Steigelfest, Jack)
July 12, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/7/2023 (Lewis, D)
June 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDERS IN REMOVED CASES (Springer, George)
June 27, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #13 Protective Order, #11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #12 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., 9 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #4 Answer to Complaint, filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #7 Disclosure Statement,, filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Real Estate Business Trust, Walmart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 6/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 26, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. for Walmart Inc.; Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust. (Springer, George)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/23/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/23/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2023 Discovery due by 12/23/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2024 Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2023.(Chartier, AnnMarie)
June 23, 2023 Filing 9 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/23.(Hushin, Z.)
June 23, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
June 23, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Ann Roy on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust (Roy, Katie)
June 23, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Other Affiliate Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associate, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust for Walmart Inc.; Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Springer, George)
June 23, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust Statement Regarding Removed Case Per Local Standing Orders (Springer, George)
June 23, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust Pending Motions (Springer, George)
June 23, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust.(Springer, George)
June 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust Certificate Of Filing Copy of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
June 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Inc., Walmart Real Estate Business Trust (Springer, George)
June 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust from Hartford, case number HHD-CV23-6170367-S., Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7393010, filed by Walmart Claims Services, Inc., Walmart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Real Estate Business Trust.(Springer, George) Modified on 6/26/2023 to add filing fee info (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levitan v. Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Levitan
Represented By: Jack G. Steigelfest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Claims Services, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?