Mader v. Heck, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Philip J Mader
Defendant: Heck, Inc. and Parsons Corporation
Case Number: 3:2023cv00880
Filed: July 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert A Richardson
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/11/2023 To File Joint Rule 26(F) Report Set Deadlines/Hearings by Parsons Corporation. (Grijalva, Larry)
August 31, 2023 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/08/2023 to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Parsons Corporation. (Grijalva, Larry)
August 21, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand by Heck, Inc..(Yagoobian, Christopher)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #17 Joint Motion for Extension of Time until 09/04/2023 To File Joint Rule 26(F) Report by Parsons Corporation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/21/2023. (Reis, Julia)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Michael D. Hutchens. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2023. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ryan L. Paukert. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2023. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 18, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. Hutchens to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7453405) by Heck, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yagoobian, Christopher)
August 18, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ryan L. Paukert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7453383) by Heck, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yagoobian, Christopher)
August 17, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/04/2023 To File Joint Rule 26(F) Report Set Deadlines/Hearings by Parsons Corporation. (Grijalva, Larry)
August 16, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Parsons Corporation to 9/1/2023. (Reis, Julia)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Second Motion for Extension of Time until 09/01/2023 to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/16/2023. (Guerrier, C.)
August 15, 2023 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/01/2023 to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Parsons Corporation. (Grijalva, Larry)
August 11, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/21/2023. (Guerrier, C.)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time until 07/18/23 to Plead (Assented to) #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/31/2023. (Guerrier, C.)
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 08/18/23 to Plead (Assented to) #1 Notice of Removal, by Heck, Inc.. (Yagoobian, Christopher) Modified text on 7/25/2023 (Reis, Julia).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until August 18, 2023 to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Parsons Corporation. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/17/2023. (Reis, Julia)
July 17, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Parsons Corporation to 8/18/2023. (Reis, Julia)
July 10, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 18, 2023 to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Parsons Corporation. (Grijalva, Larry)
July 7, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Talin Millinger on behalf of Parsons Corporation (Millinger, Alexa)
July 7, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Emmanuel Grijalva on behalf of Parsons Corporation (Grijalva, Larry)
July 7, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke R Conrad on behalf of Parsons Corporation (Conrad, Luke)
July 7, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Heck, Inc.. (Yagoobian, Christopher)
July 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Heck, Inc., 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Reis, Julia)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/3/2023. (Reis, Julia)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/3/2023. (Reis, Julia)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2023. Discovery due by 1/2/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 2/6/2024. Signed by Clerk on 7/3/2023. (Reis, Julia)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 7/3/2023.(Perez, J.)
July 3, 2023 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Perez, J.)
July 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Heck, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New London, case number KNL-CV23-6061960-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7401871, filed by Heck, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Cover Sheet)(Yagoobian, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mader v. Heck, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip J Mader
Represented By: Ryan Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heck, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Yagoobian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parsons Corporation
Represented By: Alexa Talin Millinger
Represented By: Larry Emmanuel Grijalva
Represented By: Luke R Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?