Kwolek v. NRT New England LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gemma Kwolek
Defendant: NRT New England LLC doing business as Coldwell Banker Realty, Frank Balisciano, Nancy Silverstein and Taylor Balisciano
Case Number: 3:2023cv01065
Filed: August 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2023 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT re #23 Reply to Response to Motion Affidavit of Attorney Thomas E. Crosby Signed By Attorney Thomas E. Crosby filed by Frank Balisciano, NRT New England LLC, Nancy Silverstein. (Crosby, Thomas)
October 5, 2023 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply to Memorandum of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Frank Balisciano, NRT New England LLC, Nancy Silverstein. (Crosby, Thomas)
September 27, 2023 Filing 22 First Memorandum in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Gemma Kwolek. (Sharinn, Todd)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 In light of the #20 Answer filed, #19 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) is DENIED. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/7/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
September 6, 2023 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Taylor Balisciano.(Leary, Jon)
September 6, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Taylor Balisciano by Gemma Kwolek. (Sharinn, Todd)
September 6, 2023 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Frank Balisciano, NRT New England LLC, Nancy Silverstein. (Attachments: #1 Attached Case)(Crosby, Thomas)
September 6, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Frank Balisciano, NRT New England LLC, Nancy Silverstein.Responses due by 9/27/2023 (Crosby, Thomas)
September 5, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/16/2023 (DeRubeis, B.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon C. Leary on behalf of Taylor Balisciano (Leary, Jon)
August 31, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement re: Parent & Publicly Traded Companies by Frank Balisciano, NRT New England LLC, Nancy Silverstein identifying Corporate Parent Anywhere Real Estate Inc. for NRT New England LLC. (Crosby, Thomas)
August 31, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Crosby on behalf of Frank Balisciano, NRT New England LLC, Nancy Silverstein (Crosby, Thomas)
August 23, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Frank Balisciano to 9/11/2023; Taylor Balisciano to 9/5/2023; NRT New England LLC to 9/1/2023; Nancy Silverstein to 9/5/2023. (Freberg, B)
August 23, 2023 Filing 13 First AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Frank Balisciano on August 21, 2023, filed by Gemma Kwolek. (Sharinn, Todd)
August 23, 2023 Filing 12 First AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Linda Fay on August 15, 2023, filed by Gemma Kwolek. (Sharinn, Todd)
August 23, 2023 Filing 11 First AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Steven Silverstein on August 15, 2023, filed by Gemma Kwolek. (Sharinn, Todd)
August 23, 2023 Filing 10 First AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Sherie Peterson on August 11, 2023, filed by Gemma Kwolek. (Sharinn, Todd)
August 10, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Frank Balisciano, Taylor Balisciano, NRT New England LLC, Nancy Silverstein* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd S. Sharinn* *Gilbride, Tusa, Last & Spellane* *31 Brookside Dr., PO Box 658* *Greenwich, CT 06830*. (Freberg, B)
August 10, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Gemma Kwolek, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Gemma Kwolek, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Order. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2023.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/9/2023.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/9/2023.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/9/2023.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2023; Discovery due by 2/8/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 3/14/2024. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/2023.(Freberg, B)
August 9, 2023 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)
August 9, 2023 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 8/9/23.(Hushin, Z.)
August 9, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Gemma Kwolek. (Sharinn, Todd)
August 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7443826.), filed by Gemma Kwolek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharinn, Todd)
August 9, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Sharinn, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwolek v. NRT New England LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gemma Kwolek
Represented By: Todd S. Sharinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRT New England LLC doing business as Coldwell Banker Realty
Represented By: Thomas E. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Balisciano
Represented By: Thomas E. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Silverstein
Represented By: Thomas E. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Balisciano
Represented By: Jon C. Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?