Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and Chiquita Brooks-Lasure
Case Number: 3:2023cv01103
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 29 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. In accordance with the Order previously issued, see ECF No.17, Defendants will file a cross-motion for summary judgment and a memorandum in support of the cross-motion and in opposition to BI's motion not to exceed 55 pages on or before 12/6/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 27, 2023 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Responses due by 10/18/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Christine Marsh, #3 Declaration of James T. Shearin, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Proposed Order)(Shearin, James)
September 26, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Allen Long, Jr on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Long, Robert)
September 26, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Ross Brugato on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Brugato, Thomas)
September 26, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Maya on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Maya, Michael)
September 25, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin King on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (King, Kevin)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 , #20 , #21 and #22 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
September 19, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael M. Maya, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7486497) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission of Michael M. Maya, Esq. Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
September 19, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert A. Long, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7486459) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission of Robert A. Long, Esq, Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
September 19, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kevin F. King, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7486433) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission of Kevin F. King, Esq. Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
September 19, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas R. Brugato, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7486407) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission of Thomas R. Brugato, Esq. Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
September 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Pezzi, Stephen)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion. The parties obligation to file a report under Local Rule 26(f) is suspended. On or before September 27, BI will file a motion for summary judgment and a supporting memorandum not to exceed 45 pages. On or before December 6, Defendants will file a cross-motion for summary judgment and a memorandum in support of the cross-motion and in opposition to BI's motion not to exceed 55 pages. On or before January 12, BI will file a combined reply in support of its motion and in opposition to the cross-motion not to exceed 50 pages. On or before February 12, Defendants will file a reply in support of the cross-motion not to exceed 40 pages. Unless and until ordered to do so in the future, the parties need not file Local Rule 56(a) statements of undisputed facts, and Defendants need not file an Answer to the Complaint. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/15/2023. (Chatigny, Robert)
September 15, 2023 Set Deadlines: Boehringer Ingelheim Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION To Establish Briefing Schedule and For Related Relief re #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..Responses due by 10/4/2023 (Shearin, James)
September 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Coogle on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Coogle, Christine)
August 29, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services served on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Shearin, James)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Chiquita Brooks-Lasure served on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Shearin, James)
August 29, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Xavier Becerra served on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Shearin, James)
August 29, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 8/24/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Shearin, James)
August 21, 2023 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James T. Shearin* *Pullman & Comley* *850 Main St., Po Box 7006* *Bridgeport, CT 06601-7006*. (Samson, Jessalyn)
August 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #2 Disclosure Statement, filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Protective Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/18/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/18/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2023. Discovery due by 2/17/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2024. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
August 18, 2023 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
August 18, 2023 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
August 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcy Tench Stovall on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Stovall, Marcy)
August 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Shearin on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Shearin, James)
August 18, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Shearin, James)
August 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7454391.), filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Shearin, James)
August 18, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Xavier Becerra. (Shearin, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Marcy Tench Stovall
Represented By: Robert Allen Long, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Ross Brugato
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Kevin King
Represented By: Michael Maya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Christine L. Coogle
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Christine L. Coogle
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: Christine L. Coogle
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiquita Brooks-Lasure
Represented By: Christine L. Coogle
Represented By: Stephen M. Pezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?