Fusco et al v. McLean et al
Plaintiff: David Fusco and Matthew Fusco
Defendant: GEORGE MCLEAN and Yarmouth Lumber, Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv01140
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: S Dave Vatti
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kaisen, Gary)
October 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Charles Kaisen on behalf of George McLean, Yarmouth Lumber, Inc (Kaisen, Gary)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 26(f) NOTICE: The Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties' planning meeting was due to be filed on or before 10/11/23, that is, 44 days after a defendants appearance. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 26(f)(1) (Within thirty days after the first appearance of a defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties who have appeared in the case shall confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). The conference ordinarily shall be initiated by the plaintiff, and may be conducted by telephone or electronic audio or video conferencing service. Within fourteen (14) days after the conference, the participants shall jointly complete and file a report in the form prescribed by Form 26(f), which appears in the Appendix to these Rules.). To date, the parties have not filed the Rule 26(f) Report. Accordingly, on or before 10/26/23, the parties shall confer and file the Rule 26(f) Report in compliance with the Local and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/12/23. (Velez, F.)
September 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Jay Pavano on behalf of David Fusco, Matthew Fusco (Pavano, John)
September 5, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by George McLean, Yarmouth Lumber, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
August 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by George McLean, Yarmouth Lumber, Inc, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Order, #7 Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by George McLean, Yarmouth Lumber, Inc, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Yarmouth Lumber, Inc Signed by Clerk on 8/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order to Litigants Regarding Letters to the Court Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 08/28/2023. (Peterson, M)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 08/28/2023. (Peterson, M)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 08/28/2023. (Peterson, M)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/27/2023. Discovery due by 2/27/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2024. Signed by Clerk on 08/28/2023. (Peterson, M)
August 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2023.(Perez, J.)
August 28, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
August 28, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/11/2023. (Velez, F.)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by GEORGE MCLEAN, YARMOUTH LUMBAR INC. (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by YARMOUTH LUMBAR INC.. (Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by YARMOUTH LUMBAR INC., GEORGE MCLEAN from Superior Court of the State of Connecticut, case number TTD-CV-23-6027670-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7463245, filed by YARMOUTH LUMBAR INC., GEORGE MCLEAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Pantelopoulos, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fusco et al v. McLean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Fusco
Represented By: Brian M. Flood
Represented By: John Jay Pavano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Fusco
Represented By: Brian M. Flood
Represented By: John Jay Pavano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE MCLEAN
Represented By: Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos
Represented By: Gary Charles Kaisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarmouth Lumber, Inc
Represented By: Nicholas E. Pantelopoulos
Represented By: Gary Charles Kaisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?