Dickerson et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Renee Dickerson and Keith Dickerson
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Selene Finance LP
Case Number: 3:2023cv01159
Filed: September 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Vernon D Oliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Bank of America, N.A. to 11/10/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: This case was transferred to the Honorable Vernon D. Oliver for all further proceedings. The Court vacates the 26(f) Notice at ECF No. 17. The 11/10/2023 deadline for defendant Bank of America, N.A. to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint remains in effect. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 10/25/2023. (Dao, John)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 VACATED: 26(f) NOTICE: The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties' compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty-four days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case but no report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties file on or before November 7, 2023 (1) a written statement signed by all counsel of record demonstrating that this case is exempt from the requirement of filing a Form 26(f) report; or (2) a Form 26(f) report along with a written statement signed by all counsel of record explaining why sanctions should not be imposed for the parties' failure to comply with Local Rule 26(f). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the complaint and/or monetary sanctions being imposed on counsel. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/24/2023. (Bassali, David) Modified on 10/26/2023 to add vacated per ECF No. 18 (Samson, Jessalyn).
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The #14 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Defendant will respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by November 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/24/2023. (Bassali, David)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vernon D. Oliver for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/24/2023.(Hushin, Z.)
October 23, 2023 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 10, 2023 on consent to plead, move or otherwise respond to complaint #1 Complaint, by Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolakowski, Pierre-Yves)
September 27, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Bank of America, N.A. to 10/27/2023. (Johnson, D.)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Defendant's motion for extension of time, ECF No. #12 , is GRANTED. Defendant will respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by October 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/27/2023. (Bassali, David)
September 26, 2023 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until October 27, 2023to plead, move or otherwise respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolakowski, Pierre-Yves)
September 26, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, N.A.. (Kolakowski, Pierre-Yves)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Pierre-Yves Kolakowski on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Kolakowski, Pierre-Yves)
September 18, 2023 Per #9 Summons Returned Executed, Answer deadline updated for Bank of America, N.A. to 9/27/2023; Selene Finance LP to 9/27/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 18, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Other Related Documents served on Defendants on 09/06/2023, filed by Keith Dickerson, Renee Dickerson. (Gentes, Jeffrey)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anika Singh Lemar on behalf of Keith Dickerson, Renee Dickerson (Lemar, Anika)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Bank of America, N.A., Selene Finance LP * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey S Gentes* *Yale Law School* *P.O. Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Peterson, M)
September 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, filed by Renee Dickerson, Keith Dickerson, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 09/05/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/01/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/01/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2023. Discovery due by 3/2/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/6/2024. Signed by Clerk on 09/01/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 1, 2023 Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2023.(Perez, J.)
September 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7468482.), filed by Keith Dickerson, Renee Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Gentes, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Gentes, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Dickerson
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gentes
Represented By: Anika Singh Lemar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Dickerson
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gentes
Represented By: Anika Singh Lemar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Pierre-Yves Kolakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?