Gawlik v. Reis et al
Plaintiff: Jan M. Gawlik
Defendant: Jennifer Reis, Angel Quiros, Nick Rodriguez, D. Long, Carlos Nunez, Nancy K. O'Brasky and Ebonie Suggs
Case Number: 3:2023cv01194
Filed: September 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: S Dave Vatti
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. #13 , Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may amend the complaint on or before February 4, 2024. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/7/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
November 7, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2024 (Wagner, Rebecca)
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time for 60 Days to File an Amended Complaint by Jan M. Gawlik. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (Peterson, M)
November 2, 2023 Set Deadline: Amended Complaint due by 12/4/2023. (Velez, F.)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER dismissing case. Plaintiff, who is self-represented, has "initiate[d] this 42 U.S.C. 1983 civil action of third party standing in general" and he "asserts constitutional claims of a third party," his mother. Doc. No. 1 at pp. 12-13. While the interests and urgency expressed in the motion are understandable, a self-represented litigant cannot assert claims on behalf of other persons. See Berrios v. New York Hous. Auth., 564 F.3d 130, 133 (2d Cir. 2009) (stating that an individual may represent himself with respect to his own claims, but not another's claims); see also 28 U.S.C. s. 1654 ("In all courts of the United States the parties may plead and conduct their own cases personally or by counsel as, by the rules of such courts, respectively, are permitted to manage and conduct causes therein."); Osei-Afriyie by Osei-Afriyie v. Med. Coll. of Pennsylvania, 937 F.2d 876, 883 (3d Cir. 1991) (finding that a non-attorney parent may not bring an action on behalf of their minor child); Myers v. Loudoun Cnty. Pub. Sch., 418 F.3d 395, 401 (4th Cir. 2005) (finding that non-attorney parents "generally may not litigate the claims of their minor children in federal court."); Harris v. Hutson, No. 21-6251, 2022 WL 18207371, at *2 (6th Cir. Nov. 9, 2022) (finding a litigant could not bring a claim on behalf of a student because the litigant "appear[ed] pro se and cannot represent the interests of third parties as a pro se litigant."). Accordingly, the complaint is dismissed without prejudice and Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief, ECF No. #5 , is denied as moot. Some of Plaintiff's allegations seem to assert claims on behalf of himself rather than his mother. If that is true, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint asserting only his own claims against these defendants. Any amended complaint shall be filed on or before December 4, 2023, and must comply with the pleading requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8, which requires that the complaint be a short and plain statement of the facts showing that Plaintiff is entitled to relief. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/2/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
October 12, 2023 Filing fee received from Jan Gawlik (from the State of CT Dept of Correction): $ 402.00, receipt number 20676 (Hartford) (Peterson, M)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying ECF No. #2 , Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying without prejudice ECF No. #4 , Motion to Appoint Counsel. See attached for details.Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/14/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order to Self-Represented Litigants Regarding Letters to the Court Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/11/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/11/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/11/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/11/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 11, 2023 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/11/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
September 11, 2023 Filing 5 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 10/2/2023, ), MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Jan M Gawlick. (Fanelle, N.)
September 11, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jan M Gawlick. (Fanelle, N.)
September 11, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and Financial Documents by Jan M Gawlick. (Fanelle, N.)
September 11, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jan M Gawlick. (Fanelle, N.)
September 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D. Long, Carlos Nunez, Nancy K. O'Brasky, Angel Quiros, Jennifer Reis, Nick Rodriguez, Ebonie Suggs, filed by Jan M Gawlick. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Fanelle, N.)
September 11, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gawlik v. Reis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan M. Gawlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy K. O'Brasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebonie Suggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?