Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company A/S/O Napoli Associates, LLC and Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. and Ryobi Technologies Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv01228
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/15/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:23-cv-01320, 3:23-cv-01382 by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc..Responses due by 12/4/2023 (Niederer, Eric)
November 2, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. F. Niederer on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (Niederer, Eric)
October 20, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc..(Niederer, Eric)
October 11, 2023 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Delaware, Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company. (Meggers, Peter)
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Meggers on behalf of Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company (Meggers, Peter)
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until October 23, 2023 to Answer and Respond to Complaint and request a stay in the Rule 26(f) conference requirements and Court's Standing Order by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint)(Niederer, Eric)
September 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement in Removed Cases (Niederer, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Samson, Jessalyn)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/19/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/19/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2023. Discovery due by 3/20/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/24/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/19/23.(Hushin, Z.)
September 19, 2023 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Niederer, Eric)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS (Niederer, Eric)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc. from Superior Court, J.D. of New Britain, case number HHB-CV-23-6081186-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7487033, filed by One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., Ryobi Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Record - Exhibit A & B)(Niederer, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company A/S/O Napoli Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: John Higgins Kane
Represented By: Peter Meggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies Inc
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?