Salgado v. United States Liability Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Yahaira Maca Salgado
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01233
Filed: September 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Mtn to Amend_Nov. 2019 denial letter to insured, #2 Exhibit Ex B to Mtn to Amend__Proposed Amended Answer (Red-Lined), #3 Exhibit Ex C to Mtn to Amend__Proposed Amended Answer (Clean))(Gemmell, Ian)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE re #14 MOTION to Strike #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses filed by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Gemmell, Ian)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adopts the following schedule for pre-trial deadlines based on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, the Court's preferences with respect to scheduling, and the Court's current calendar:- Initial disclosures due by January 5, 2024.- Damages analysis due by March 1, 2024.- Designation of expert witnesses due by March 1, 2024 (Plaintiff).- Depositions of expert witnesses shall be completed by April 5, 2024 (Plaintiff).- Designation of expert witnesses due by May 10, 2024 (Defendant).- Depositions of expert witnesses shall be completed by June 14, 2024 (Defendant).- Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by July 12, 2024.- All discovery shall close by July 12, 2024.- If, after the close of discovery, the parties wish to meet with a Magistrate Judge to discuss settlement, the parties may jointly file such a request by July 18, 2024.- Dispositive motions due by September 6, 2024.- Responses to dispositive motions due by October 11, 2024. - Joint trial memorandum is due by November 15, 2024, or thirty (30) days after the Court rules on any dispositive motions.- Trial ready date is January 13, 2025, or thirty (30) days after the joint trial memorandum is filed.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/6/2023. (Thompson, M.)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gemmell, Ian)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Strike #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses. Responses due by 11/9/2023 (Imbriani, Susan)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for extension of time to file response/reply as to Plaintiff's #14 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses until November 9, 2023. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/1/2023. (Thompson, M.)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Strike #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses until 11/9/2023 by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Gemmell, Ian)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #13 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses by Yahaira Maca Salgado.Responses due by 11/2/2023 (Isaac, Leonard)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by United States Liability Insurance Company.(Gemmell, Ian)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by United States Liability Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Gemmell, Ian)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Yahaira Maca Salgado. (Isaac, Leonard)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Merrill Isaac on behalf of Yahaira Maca Salgado (Isaac, Leonard)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Disclosure Statement filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by United States Liability Insurance Company, #8 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by United States Liability Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Imbriani, Susan)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Gemmell, Ian)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/20/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/20/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/19/2023, Discovery due by 3/21/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by United States Liability Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Gemmell, Ian)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by United States Liability Insurance Company of No Pending Motions (Gemmell, Ian)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Liability Insurance Company from Putnam JD, case number WWM-CV23-6027505-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7488840, filed by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gemmell, Ian)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salgado v. United States Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahaira Maca Salgado
Represented By: Leonard Merrill Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian James Gemmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?