Jackson v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Jackson
Defendant: Nirmal Singh and Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01239
Filed: September 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. In light of the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal, ECF No. 19, the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/2/2023. (Parfenoff, Ivan)
September 29, 2023 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh. (Vossler, Christopher)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. By October 6, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a notice regarding whether it intends to file an amended complaint, in light of Defendants' statement that Defendant Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc. has been incorrectly named as a party, see ECF No. 16, or whether it seeks for the Court to drop Defendant Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc. from this action and add Defendant Nirmal A. Singh d/b/a JA Brothers Transport, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 9/29/2023. (Parfenoff, Ivan)
September 28, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh.(Guzzo, Hannah)
September 28, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement Corporate by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh. (Guzzo, Hannah)
September 25, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc. to 9/28/2023; Nirmal Singh to 9/28/2023. (Bozek, M.)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2)(3), Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by September 28, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 9/25/2023. (Parfenoff, Ivan)
September 22, 2023 Filing 14 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 22, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice (Other) filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., #11 Electronic Filing Order, 9 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., #12 Protective Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., #5 Jury Demand filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., #7 Notice (Other) filed by Nirmal Singh, Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 9/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 9/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2023. Discovery due by 3/22/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/26/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 21, 2023 Filing 9 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/21/2023.(Perez, J.)
September 21, 2023 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
September 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Guzzo on behalf of Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh (Guzzo, Hannah)
September 21, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Counsel Re Local Rule 5(b) (Vossler, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh re #1 Notice of Removal, Compliance with Standing Order (Vossler, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh. (Vossler, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh (Vossler, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Vossler, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal(Superior Court))(Vossler, Christopher)
September 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh from Hartford Superior Court, case number HD4 HHD CV 23 6173144S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7490544, filed by Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc., Nirmal Singh. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint)(Vossler, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jackson
Represented By: Sydney T. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirmal Singh
Represented By: Hannah Guzzo
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jainur Brother's Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Guzzo
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?