Cantafi et al v. Graybeal et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cantafi, Dana Andrews and Danielle Kornacki
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc., Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Ashley Sulewski and Stephanie Graybeal
Case Number: 3:2023cv01245
Filed: September 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 25 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Stephanie Graybeal.Responses due by 12/11/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Cannon, Karess)
November 14, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Gerard Betke on behalf of Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (Betke, Christopher)
November 13, 2023 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Ashley Sulewski, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Levites, Benjamin)
November 13, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Ashley Sulewski, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Levites, Benjamin)
October 31, 2023 Filing 21 OBJECTION re #20 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Ashley Sulewski, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Levites, Benjamin)
October 10, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Dana Andrews, Elizabeth Cantafi(Administratrix of the Estate of Zachary Cantafi), Elizabeth Cantafi, Danielle Kornacki.Responses due by 10/31/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Krayeske, Kenneth)
October 10, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Christopher Bowman on behalf of Dana Andrews, Elizabeth Cantafi(Administratrix of the Estate of Zachary Cantafi), Elizabeth Cantafi, Danielle Kornacki (Bowman, Peter)
October 10, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth James Krayeske on behalf of Dana Andrews, Elizabeth Cantafi(Administratrix of the Estate of Zachary Cantafi), Elizabeth Cantafi, Danielle Kornacki (Krayeske, Kenneth)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Graybeal shall file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by November 20, 2023.Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/4/2023. (Bernard, Hannah)
October 4, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Stephanie Graybeal to 11/20/2023. (Bernard, Hannah)
October 3, 2023 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 20, 2023 to file a response to plaintiff complaint by Stephanie Graybeal. (Cannon, Karess)
September 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Karess Ashantia Cannon on behalf of Stephanie Graybeal (Cannon, Karess)
September 29, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Ashley Sulewski, Uber Technologies, Inc..(Levites, Benjamin)
September 29, 2023 Filing 13 EXHIBIT Stmt. under Standing Order on Removed Cases by Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Ashley Sulewski, Uber Technologies, Inc. re #3 Disclosure Statement. (Levites, Benjamin)
September 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Ashley Sulewski, Uber Technologies, Inc. of No Pending Motions (Levites, Benjamin)
September 29, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Ashley Sulewski, Uber Technologies, Inc. re #9 Electronic Service Documents,, (Levites, Benjamin)
September 29, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Halloran Levites on behalf of Vincent Lisi, Edgar Pastrana, Ashley Sulewski (Levites, Benjamin)
September 25, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #8 Protective Order, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Portier, LLC, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Portier, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc., Portier, LLC. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Fanelle, N.)
September 25, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. O'Leary on behalf of Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. (O'Leary, Kevin)
September 25, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uber Technologies, Inc. for Portier, LLC, Rasier, LLC. (Levites, Benjamin)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/22/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/22/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/21/2023 Discovery due by 3/23/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 4/27/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
September 22, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
September 22, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
September 22, 2023 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
September 22, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rasier, LLC, Portier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court-Hartford Judicial District, case number HHD-CV23-6174200-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7492340, filed by Rasier, LLC, Portier, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Levites, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantafi et al v. Graybeal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Cantafi
Represented By: Kaitlin A Halloran
Represented By: Kenneth James Krayeske
Represented By: Peter Christopher Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Andrews
Represented By: Kenneth James Krayeske
Represented By: Peter Christopher Bowman
Represented By: Kaitlin A Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Kornacki
Represented By: Peter Christopher Bowman
Represented By: Kaitlin A Halloran
Represented By: Kenneth James Krayeske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Halloran Levites
Represented By: Christopher Gerard Betke
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portier, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Halloran Levites
Represented By: Christopher Gerard Betke
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasier, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Halloran Levites
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Leary
Represented By: Christopher Gerard Betke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Lisi
Represented By: Benjamin Halloran Levites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Pastrana
Represented By: Benjamin Halloran Levites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Sulewski
Represented By: Benjamin Halloran Levites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Graybeal
Represented By: Karess Ashantia Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?