Larhon Harper v. Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Khayla Larhon Harper
Defendant: Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC, Ali Zanta and Westlake Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01250
Filed: September 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Fraud-Motor Vehicle (Odometer)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC and Ali Zanta by Khayla Larhon Harper. (Blinn, Daniel)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Westlake Services, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by December 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/22/2023. (Hagemann, Emma)
November 22, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Westlake Services, LLC to 12-22-2023 per Dkt. 19 Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 21, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/22/2023 to respond to complaint by Westlake Services, LLC. (Young, Daniel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Young on behalf of Westlake Services, LLC (Young, Daniel)
November 7, 2023 Set deadline: entry of a default due by 11-27-2023 per Dkt. 16 order. (Shafer, J.)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO ANSWER OR TIMELY RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Defendants Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC and Ali Zanta were required to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by November 1, 2023. See ECF Nos. 13, 15. Given Defendants' failure to timely file an answer or other response to the complaint, the Court directs Plaintiff to move for entry of a default against Defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) on or before November 27, 2023. Failure to do so will result in the Court dismissing the case for failure to prosecute. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 41(a). In the event that either of these Defendants chooses in the interim to file an answer or other response to the complaint, such Defendant shall also file a motion for extension of time nunc pro tunc stating why there is good cause for its failure to comply with the scheduling requirements of the Court and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/6/23.(Hagemann, Emma)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Westlake Services, LLC, shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by November 22, 2023. In granting this motion, however, the Court notes that counsel for Plaintiff has provided no reason why the motion for extension of time was not timely filed. Counsel are reminded that pursuant to Local Rule 7(b)(3): "All motions for extension of time shall be filed at least three (3) business days before the deadline sought to be extended, except in cases in which compelling circumstances warranting an extension arise during the three days before the deadline. Any motion for extension of time filed fewer than three business days before the deadline sought to be extended shall, in addition to satisfying all other requirements of this Rule, set forth reasons why the motion was not filed at least three business days before the deadline in question." Future failures to comply with Local Rule 7(b)(3) may result in the denial of non-compliant motions for extension of time without prejudice to refiling of a compliant motion.The deadline for Defendants Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC and Ali Zanta to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint remains November 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/1/2023. (Hagemann, Emma)
November 1, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Westlake Services, LLC to 11-22-2023 per Dkt. 15 Order. (Shafer, J.)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 3 weeks for the defendant Westlake Financial Services to answer the complaint by Khayla Larhon Harper. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 18, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC, and Ali Zanta to 11/1/2023. (Bozek, M.)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. All Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by November 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/18/23.(Hagemann, Emma)
October 16, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Khayla Larhon Harper. Westlake Services, LLC served on 10/2/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Khayla Larhon Harper. (Blinn, Daniel)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Khayla Larhon Harper. Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023; Ali Zanta served on 10/11/2023, answer due 11/1/2023. (Blinn, Daniel)
September 26, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ali Zanta* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Mendez, D)
September 26, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Westlake Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Mendez, D)
September 26, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Mendez, D)
September 26, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Khayla Larhon Harper, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 9/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 9/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/24/2023. Discovery due by 3/26/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2024. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2023. (Mendez, D)
September 25, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2023.(Perez, J.)
September 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC, Westlake Services, LLC, Ali Zanta ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7493853.), filed by Khayla Larhon Harper.(Blinn, Daniel)
September 25, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
September 25, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Westlake Services, LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
September 25, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ali Zanta. (Blinn, Daniel)
September 25, 2023 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larhon Harper v. Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khayla Larhon Harper
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kensington Family Auto Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Zanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?