Lowe v. Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Plaintiff: Brigette Lowe
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01256
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
2 Judge: Vernon D Oliver
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC to 12/18/2023. (Samson, Jessalyn)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time #24 . The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to December 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 11/14/2023. (Rogers, Da'Shaun)
November 10, 2023 Filing 24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2023ON CONSENT Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Update Answer Deadline by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC. (Kelson, Jonathan)
November 7, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Carlo Franzini on behalf of Brigette Lowe (Franzini, Simon)
November 7, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Grace Bennett on behalf of Brigette Lowe (Bennett, Grace)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Grace Bennett. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/2/2024. Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2023. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Simon Franzini. Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2023. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 2, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Grace Bennett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7536191) by Brigette Lowe. (Raabe, Craig)
November 2, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Simon Franzini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7536176) by Brigette Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Raabe, Craig)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vernon D. Oliver for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2023.(Hushin, Z.)
October 20, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan McCurdy on behalf of Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC (McCurdy, Megan)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Megan A McCurdy #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2023. (Chartier, A)
October 19, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Megan A McCurdy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7520262) by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kelson, Jonathan)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Consent MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (Doc. #12 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/17/2023. (Lewis, D)
October 17, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC to 11/20/2023. (Lewis, D)
October 16, 2023 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC. (Kelson, Jonathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC. (Kelson, Jonathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan J. Kelson on behalf of Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC (Kelson, Jonathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P. Whitcomb on behalf of Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
October 16, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Volpe on behalf of Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC (Volpe, Christina)
September 27, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Chartier, A)
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Brigette Lowe, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2023.(Chartier, A)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/26/2023.(Chartier, A)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/26/2023.(Chartier, A)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2023 Discovery due by 3/27/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2024 Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2023.(Chartier, A)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/23.(Hushin, Z.)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EDGEWELL PERSONAL CARE BRANDS LLC ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7494662.), filed by BRIGETTE LOWE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CLRA Venue Declaration - Brigette Lowe)(Raabe, Craig)
September 26, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to EDGEWELL PERSONAL CARE BRANDS LLC. (Raabe, Craig)
September 26, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brigette Lowe
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Grace Bennett
Represented By: Simon Carlo Franzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgewell Personal Care Brands, LLC
Represented By: Christina Volpe
Represented By: Megan McCurdy
Represented By: Jonathan J. Kelson
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?