Edwards v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mervyn Edwards
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership and Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01279
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: S Dave Vatti
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 19 Amended REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dwyer, Renee)
November 14, 2023 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/1/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2024; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 5/1/2025; Trial Ready Date 6/1/2025. (Velez, F.)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The court thanks defense counsel for filing a Local Rule 26(f) Report. See ECF No. #17 . Within a footnote of the report, defense counsel informs the court that Plaintiff's counsel failed to respond to requests to meet and confer in accordance with the Federal and Local Rules. Accordingly, the court hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed by Defendants. All discovery shall be completed on or before March 1, 2025, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. The parties hereby are granted permission to serve more than 25 interrogatories. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before October 31, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before May 1, 2025, if no dispositive motions are filed, or within the period set by the court upon its disposition of any dispositive motions that are filed. The court thereafter will set a jury selection date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to trial on June 1, 2025. Finally, the court notes that Local Rule 26(f) requires the parties to confer and to jointly submit the report that Defendants were left to file on their own. This initial conference is not optional. See L. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(1) (mandating that "the attorneys of record... shall confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f).") (emphasis added). In fact, "[t]he conference ordinarily shall be initiated by the plaintiff...." Id. (emphasis added). Given the lack of participation from Plaintiff's counsel in drafting the report, any motion from Plaintiff seeking to modify these deadlines also must contain an explanation for such noncompliance. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/14/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
November 13, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Carlson on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Carlson, Daniel)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dwyer, Renee)
October 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Lenes on behalf of Mervyn Edwards (Lenes, James)
October 2, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., #11 Protective Order, 13 Notice 83.1,, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, #12 Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., #7 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 9/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Order to Litigants Regarding Letters to the Court Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/28/2023. Discovery due by 3/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2024. Signed by Clerk on 09/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/29/2023.(Perez, J.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. re: Standing Orders (Dwyer, Renee)
September 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Wocl Dwyer on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Dwyer, Renee)
September 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. re: Civil & Miscellaneous Orders (Dwyer, Renee)
September 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. re: Pending Motions (Dwyer, Renee)
September 29, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Dwyer, Renee)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee Wocl Dwyer on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Dwyer, Renee)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. from Starmford Superior Court, case number FST-CV23-6063094-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7499682, filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc..(Dwyer, Renee)
September 29, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/12/2023. (Velez, F.)
September 29, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Wal-Mart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mervyn Edwards
Represented By: James A. Lenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Represented By: Daniel Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Represented By: Daniel Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Renee Wocl Dwyer
Represented By: Daniel Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?