Cuomo v. Flecha et al
Plaintiff: John David Cuomo
Defendant: Angel Luis Flecha and Regency Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01280
Filed: September 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John David Cuomo.(Loricco, Ronald)
November 13, 2023 Set Deadline: Discovery due by 12/31/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2024; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 2/1/2025; Trial Ready Date 3/1/2025. (Velez, F.)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The court thanks the parties for their Local Rule 26(f) Report. See ECF No. #15 . The court hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein. All discovery shall be completed on or before December 31, 2024, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. The parties hereby are granted permission to serve more than 25 interrogatories. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before October 1, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before February 1, 2025, if no dispositive motions are filed, or within the period set by the court upon its disposition of any dispositive motions that are filed. The court thereafter will set a jury selection date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to trial on March 1, 2025. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/13/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Alexander, Maria)
October 23, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Alexander on behalf of Angel Luis Flecha, Regency Transportation, Inc. (Alexander, Maria)
October 17, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven H. Malitz on behalf of Angel Luis Flecha, Regency Transportation, Inc. (Malitz, Steven)
October 11, 2023 Filing 12 First Disclosure Statement by John David Cuomo. (Loricco, Ronald)
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Joseph Loricco on behalf of John David Cuomo (Loricco, Ronald)
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Angel Luis Flecha, Regency Transportation, Inc., #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Regency Transportation, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Angel Luis Flecha, Regency Transportation, Inc., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 10/2/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 9/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order to Litigants Regarding Letters to the Court Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 09/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/28/2023. Discovery due by 3/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2024. Signed by Clerk on 09/29/2023. (Peterson, M)
September 29, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/29/2023.(Perez, J.)
September 29, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Regency Transportation, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
September 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kenney on behalf of Angel Luis Flecha, Regency Transportation, Inc. (Kenney, Michael)
September 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regency Transportation, Inc., Angel Luis Flecha from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV23-6135953-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7499775, filed by Regency Transportation, Inc., Angel Luis Flecha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Removal filed in State Court)(Kenney, Michael)
September 29, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/12/2023. (Velez, F.)
September 29, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuomo v. Flecha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John David Cuomo
Represented By: Ronald Joseph Loricco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Luis Flecha
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Represented By: Maria Alexander
Represented By: Steven H. Malitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Represented By: Maria Alexander
Represented By: Steven H. Malitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?