Polvere v. Vansteenburgh et al
Plaintiff: John Polvere
Defendant: Kyle Vansteenburgh and Comlinx Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01299
Filed: October 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for all settlement purposes. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11-9-2023. (Shafer, J.)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by December 20, 2024. Dispositive motions due by January 21, 2025. An initial Status Report due by September 20, 2024. A second Status Report due by January 2, 2025.All further deadlines are set forth in the attached scheduling order. Note that some of the dates in the scheduling order differ from those proposed by the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. As the Court has largely afforded the parties their proposed discovery schedule, which is longer than the Court's preferred schedule, it will not look favorably upon requests to extend the discovery timeline.The Clerk is directed to refer this action to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for purposes of assessing the timing of a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/9/2023. (Parfenoff, Ivan)
November 9, 2023 Set deadline: discovery due by 12-20-2024, dispositive motions due by 1-21-2025, and status report due by 9-20-2024 and 1-2-2025. (Shafer, J.)
November 8, 2023 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mather, Richard)
October 19, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Mahar on behalf of John Polvere (Mahar, James)
October 18, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Mahar on behalf of John Polvere Plaintiff (Mahar, James)
October 11, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Comlinx Inc., Kyle Vansteenburgh.(Mather, Richard)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by October 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/10/2023. (Parfenoff, Ivan)
October 6, 2023 Filing 13 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice (Other) filed by Kyle Vansteenburgh, Comlinx Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kyle Vansteenburgh, Comlinx Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Kyle Vansteenburgh, Comlinx Inc., #2 Notice (Other) filed by Kyle Vansteenburgh, Comlinx Inc., #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Kyle Vansteenburgh, Comlinx Inc., 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #11 Protective Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Kyle Vansteenburgh, Comlinx Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by Kyle Vansteenburgh, Comlinx Inc. Signed by Clerk on 10/6/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/5/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/5/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2023. Discovery due by 4/5/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/10/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 5, 2023 Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/5/2023.(Perez, J.)
October 5, 2023 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
October 5, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard William Mather on behalf of Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle (Mather, Richard)
October 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle (Mather, Richard)
October 5, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle (Mather, Richard)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle (Mather, Richard)
October 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle (Mather, Richard)
October 5, 2023 Filing 2 Civil Cover sheet by Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle re #1 Notice of Removal (Mather, Richard) Modified on 10/6/2023 to correct docket text (Perez, J.).
October 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle from CT Superior Court of Waterbury at Waterbury, case number UWY-CV-23-6072841-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7506104, filed by Comlinx Inc., Vansteenburgh Kyle.(Mather, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polvere v. Vansteenburgh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Polvere
Represented By: Alison Reilly Gillotti
Represented By: James A. Mahar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Vansteenburgh
Represented By: Richard William Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comlinx Inc.
Represented By: Richard William Mather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?