Richard et al v. Grossman Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Y Richard and Virgina Richard
Defendant: The Grossman Companies, Inc., David B Grossman and Grossman Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01314
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE regarding hearing: A scheduling conference is set for 12-8-2023 at 2:00 pm before Judge Sarala V. Nagala to be conducted via Zoom. Call-in and Public Access Number: 646-828-7666Meeting ID: 160 335 7989 Meeting Password: 240163The Court will distribute the video link to the parties via email.Please note: Members of the public are permitted to join this hearing by audio only using the public access number above. Video participation is permitted by the parties and counsel only. This is in accordance with the remote access policies of the Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Shafer, J.)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Included in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report is an apparent request to extend the deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. See ECF No. 19 at 7. Should Defendants seek to extend the current deadline of December 15, 2023, they must file a motion to do so pursuant to Local Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/27/2023.(Hagemann, Emma)
November 22, 2023 Filing 19 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buckley, Meghan)
November 17, 2023 Answer deadline updated to 12-15-2023 per Dkt. 18 Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by December 15, 2023. In granting this motion, however, the Court notes that counsel for Defendants has provided no reason why the motion for extension of time was not timely filed. Counsel are reminded that pursuant to Local Rule 7(b)(3): "All motions for extension of time shall be filed at least three (3) business days before the deadline sought to be extended, except in cases in which compelling circumstances warranting an extension arise during the three days before the deadline. Any motion for extension of time filed fewer than three business days before the deadline sought to be extended shall, in addition to satisfying all other requirements of this Rule, set forth reasons why the motion was not filed at least three business days before the deadline in question." Future failures to comply with Local Rule 7(b)(3) may result in the denial of non-compliant motions for extension of time without prejudice to refiling of a compliant motion. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/16/23. (Hagemann, Emma)
November 15, 2023 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until December 15, 2023 to Plead by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc.. (Elstein, Bruce)
October 13, 2023 Answer deadline updated for David B Grossman to 11/15/2023; Grossman Companies, Inc. to 11/15/2023. (Bozek, M.)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by November 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/13/2023. (Hagemann, Emma)
October 12, 2023 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed (Supplemental Return) Acknowledgment filed by Jean Y Richard, Virgina Richard. (Buckley, Meghan)
October 12, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 15, 2023 to Plead by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc.. (Elstein, Bruce)
October 12, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan F Buckley on behalf of Jean Y Richard, Virgina Richard (Buckley, Meghan)
October 11, 2023 Answer deadline updated for David B Grossman to 10/16/2023; Grossman Companies, Inc. to 10/16/2023. (Bozek, M.)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is due October 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/11/2023.(Hagemann, Emma)
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc., 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #9 Protective Order, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc., #3 Notice (Other) filed by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc., #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc.. (Elstein, Bruce)
October 9, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/22/2023. (Bozek, M.)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/9/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/9/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2023. Discovery due by 4/9/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 9, 2023 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/9/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 9, 2023 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
October 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (Elstein, Bruce) Modified on 10/10/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
October 9, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc. Statement in Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Elstein, Bruce) Modified on 10/10/2023 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc. NOTICE OF NO PENDING MOTIONS (Elstein, Bruce) Modified on 10/10/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
October 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc. from Superior Court, Judicial District of Stamford/Noralk at Stamford for the State of Connecticut, case number FST-CV23-6063359-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7508470, filed by David B Grossman, Grossman Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Summons, Complaint and Amended Officer's Return to Court)(Elstein, Bruce) Modified on 10/10/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard et al v. Grossman Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Y Richard
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Meghan F Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgina Richard
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Meghan F Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Grossman Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce L. Elstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B Grossman
Represented By: Bruce L. Elstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grossman Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce L. Elstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?