Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America as subrogee of 30 Knotter Drive Corporation doing business as Avventura Bakery & Deli
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. and Ryobi Technologies Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv01320
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
2 Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David S. Huberman. Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2023. (Gaskins, A.)
November 15, 2023 Cases associated. Create association to 3:23-cv-01228-RNC. (Gaskins A.)
November 15, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) David S. Huberman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7550483) by Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Creager, Catherine)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER: The Honorable Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer hereby transfers the above-identified case to the docket of THE HONORABLE Robert N. Chatigny for all purposes. All future pleadings and filings in this case shall bear docket number3:23CV1320 (RNC). Pleadings or documents related to this action shall be filed with the Clerks Office in Hartford, Connecticut, where the docket is maintained. [See Local Rule 3(a).] Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/14/2023.(Lewis, D)
November 8, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/18/2023 (Lewis, D)
November 6, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Citizens Insurance Company of America. One World Technologies, Inc. served on 11/6/2023, answer due 11/27/2023; Ryobi Technologies Inc served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc. served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Creager, Catherine)
November 3, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc..(Niederer, Eric)
November 2, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement F.R.C.P. 7.1. CORPORATE DISCLOSURE by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Niederer, Eric)
November 2, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. F. Niederer on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (Niederer, Eric)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Catherine L. Creager* *Coles, Baldwin, Kaiser & Creager, LLC* *1 Eliot Place, Third Floor* *Fairfield, CT 06824*. (Chartier, A)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2023.(Chartier, A)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/11/2023.(Chartier, A)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 10/11/2023.(Chartier, A)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2023 Discovery due by 4/11/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2024 Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2023.(Chartier, A)
October 11, 2023 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/11/2023.(Perez, J.)
October 11, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Citizens Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Hanover Ins Group Inc for Citizens Insurance Company of America. (Creager, Catherine)
October 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7510735.), filed by Citizens Insurance Company of America.(Creager, Catherine)
October 11, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Creager, Catherine)
October 11, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens Insurance Company of America v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Insurance Company of America as subrogee of 30 Knotter Drive Corporation doing business as Avventura Bakery & Deli
Represented By: Catherine L. Creager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies Inc
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?