Chima Enterprise Inc. et al v. Chubb National Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Chima Enterprise Inc. and Bruno Chima
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company and Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2023cv01331
Filed: October 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court GRANTS the MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss until January 17, 2024. In the future, any such requests should be accompanied with a statement indicating whether the opposing party has been notified of the motion to extend time, and has consented to it. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/30/2023. (Rafla-Yuan, Deanna)
November 29, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss until January 17, 2024 by Bruno Chima, Chima Enterprise Inc.. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
November 17, 2023 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Laurie, Robert)
November 17, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Company.Responses due by 12/8/2023 (Laurie, Robert)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/18/2023 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/18/2023. (Rafla-Yuan, Deanna)
October 17, 2023 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/18/2023 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
October 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice (Other) filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, #9 Disclosure Statement, filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, #7 Disclosure Statement, filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, #5 Disclosure Statement, filed by Chubb National Insurance Company, #12 Electronic Filing Order, #10 Disclosure Statement, filed by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, #14 Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, #13 Disclosure Statement, filed by Chubb National Insurance Company, #11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Disclosure Statement, filed by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Barry, L)
October 13, 2023 Filing 13 Amended Disclosure Statement by Chubb National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Chubb National Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
October 13, 2023 Filing 10 Amended Disclosure Statement by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
October 13, 2023 Filing 9 Amended Disclosure Statement by Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co. (Laurie, Robert)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/12/2023.(Barry, L)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/12/2023.(Barry, L)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/11/2023 Discovery due by 4/12/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 5/17/2024 Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2023.(Barry, L)
October 12, 2023 Filing 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/12/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
October 12, 2023 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)
October 12, 2023 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
October 12, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Chubb National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Chubb National Insurance Company. (Laurie, Robert)
October 12, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company of Statement of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Laurie, Robert)
October 12, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company of Pending Motions (Laurie, Robert)
October 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Laurie on behalf of ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company (Laurie, Robert)
October 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company from Connecticut Superior Court, case number AAN-CV23-6052604-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7513054, filed by ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Company, ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Laurie, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chima Enterprise Inc. et al v. Chubb National Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chima Enterprise Inc.
Represented By: Ikechukwu Umeugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruno Chima
Represented By: Ikechukwu Umeugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Fire Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Fire Underwriters Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert D. Laurie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?