Veto Pro Pac LLC v. Velocity Workwear Ltd.
Plaintiff: Veto Pro Pac LLC
Defendant: Velocity Workwear Ltd. doing business as Velocity Pro Gear and Tool Monster Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01349
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: S Dave Vatti
Referring Judge: Omar A Williams
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting ECF No. #21 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint on or before January 17, 2024. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 12/14/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
December 14, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Tool Monster Ltd. to 1/17/2024; Velocity Workwear Ltd. to 1/17/2024. (Wagner, Rebecca)
December 13, 2023 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until January 17, 2024 Answer #20 Amended Complaint by Veto Pro Pac LLC. (Lehberger, Benjamin)
December 13, 2023 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Veto Pro Pac LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lehberger, Benjamin)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 MOTION for Attorney Benjamin T. Horton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2023. (Peterson, M)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting ECF No. #15 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before December 27, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/30/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
November 30, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Velocity Workwear Ltd. to 12/27/2023. (Wagner, Rebecca)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Benjamin T. Horton to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7563150) by Velocity Workwear Ltd.. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Gibbons on behalf of Velocity Workwear Ltd. (Gibbons, Matthew)
November 21, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/4/2024. (Velez, Frances)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 27, 2023 to respond to #1 Complaint, by Velocity Workwear Ltd.. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 21, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by Velocity Workwear Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent BAM investire Limited for Velocity Workwear Ltd.. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 21, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Fahey on behalf of Velocity Workwear Ltd. (Fahey, Patrick)
November 15, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veto Pro Pac LLC. Velocity Workwear Ltd. served on 11/3/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. (Lehberger, Benjamin)
October 17, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Velocity Workwear Ltd.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Benjamin J. Lehberger* *Dilworth IP LLC* *470 James Street, Suite 007* *New Haven, CT 06513*. (Peterson, M)
October 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Veto Pro Pac LLC, #9 Report on Patent/Trademark Form, #1 Complaint, filed by Veto Pro Pac LLC, #7 Order, #8 Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #6 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/17/2023. (Peterson, M)
October 16, 2023 Filing 9 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Peterson, M)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order on Patent Cases Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/16/2023. (Peterson, M)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order to Litigants Regarding Letters to the Court Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/16/2023. (Peterson, M)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/16/2023. (Peterson, M)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/16/2023. (Peterson, M)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2023. Discovery due by 4/16/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2023. (Peterson, M)
October 16, 2023 Filing 3 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2023.(Perez, J.)
October 16, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Veto Pro Pac LLC. (Lehberger, Benjamin)
October 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Velocity Workwear Ltd. d/b/a Velocity Pro Gear ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7515567.), filed by Veto Pro Pac LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Lehberger, Benjamin)
October 16, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Velocity Workwear Ltd. d/b/a Velocity Pro Gear. (Lehberger, Benjamin)
October 16, 2023 Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veto Pro Pac LLC v. Velocity Workwear Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veto Pro Pac LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Workwear Ltd. doing business as Velocity Pro Gear
Represented By: Matthew Gibbons
Represented By: Patrick M. Fahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tool Monster Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?