Roumeliotis v. Nordenson et al
Plaintiff: George I. Roumeliotis
Defendant: Mark H. Nordenson, Eileen Maguire and John A. Bly
Case Number: 3:2023cv01366
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Venue
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part #21 Motion for Extension of Time until January 12, 2024 to Answer or Plead. The time to respond is January 12, 2024. However, the 7 week period to respond, by Plaintiff is excessive. That deadline will be February 9, 2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/13/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
December 13, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/26/2024 (DeRubeis, B.)
December 13, 2023 Answer deadline updated for John A. Bly to 1/12/2024; Eileen Maguire to 1/12/2024; Mark H. Nordenson to 1/12/2024. (Sichanh, Christina)
December 12, 2023 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 12, 2024 Answer or Plead by John A. Bly, Eileen Maguire, Mark H. Nordenson. (Daley, Meghan)
December 12, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Daley on behalf of John A. Bly, Eileen Maguire, Mark H. Nordenson (Daley, Meghan)
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Palmeri on behalf of John A. Bly, Eileen Maguire, Mark H. Nordenson (Palmeri, Brian)
November 14, 2023 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Connolly to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7520032) by George I. Roumeliotis. (Connolly, Michael)
November 3, 2023 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mark H. Nordenson waiver sent on 10/24/2023, answer due 12/23/2023; John A. Bly waiver sent on 10/24/2023, answer due 12/23/2023; Eileen Maguire waiver sent on 10/24/2023, answer due 12/23/2023 filed by George I. Roumeliotis. (Lavoie, Julie)
October 25, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Cohn on behalf of George I. Roumeliotis (Cohn, Daniel)
October 25, 2023 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel C. Cohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7520025) by George I. Roumeliotis. (Cohn, Daniel)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Attorney Michael P. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/18/2023. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2023. (Freberg, B)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Daniel C. Cohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 12/18/2023. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2023. (Freberg, B)
October 19, 2023 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *John A. Bly, Eileen Maguire, Mark H. Nordenson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Taruna Garg* *Murtha Cullina LLP* *107 Elm Street, Four Stamford Plaza, Suite 1101* *Stamford, CT 06902*. (Freberg, B)
October 19, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #10 Order, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel C. Cohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7520025) filed by George I. Roumeliotis, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by George I. Roumeliotis, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by George I. Roumeliotis, #1 Complaint filed by George I. Roumeliotis, #9 Protective Order, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Connolly to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7520032) filed by George I. Roumeliotis Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Lavoie on behalf of George I. Roumeliotis (Lavoie, Julie)
October 19, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Garg, Taruna)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/18/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/18/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/18/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2023; Discovery due by 4/19/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 18, 2023 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael P. Connolly to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7520032) by George I. Roumeliotis. (Garg, Taruna)
October 18, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel C. Cohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7520025) by George I. Roumeliotis. (Garg, Taruna)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by George I. Roumeliotis. (Garg, Taruna)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7519946.), filed by George I. Roumeliotis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garg, Taruna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roumeliotis v. Nordenson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George I. Roumeliotis
Represented By: Taruna Garg
Represented By: Daniel Cohn
Represented By: Julie A. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark H. Nordenson
Represented By: Meghan K. Daley
Represented By: Brian J. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Maguire
Represented By: Brian J. Palmeri
Represented By: Meghan K. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Bly
Represented By: Meghan K. Daley
Represented By: Brian J. Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?