McAlpine v. Walmart Store #2170 et al
Plaintiff: Linda McAlpine
Defendant: Walmart Store #2170, Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership and Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Case Number: 3:2023cv01371
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE by Linda McAlpine re 20 Order,,, (Cameron, Pamela)
November 28, 2023 Set deadlines: discovery due by 12-1-2024; dispositive motions due by 1-3-2025; and status reports due by 9-2-2024 and 12-9-2024 per #19 Scheduling Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. In the Rule 26(f) report, Plaintiff states that she contests the Court's subject matter jurisdiction, but she does not specify on what basis. By December 11, 2023, Plaintiff shall file a notice specifying why she believes the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this matter. If Plaintiff withdraws her objection to the Court exercising subject matter jurisdiction over this case, she must so state in the notice. Plaintiff may also choose to file, instead, a motion to remand the action to state court on the basis of lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If a motion to remand is filed, the Court will vacate the deadlines set forth in the scheduling order pending resolution of the motion. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/27/2023.(Piccolo, Marissa)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by December 1, 2024. Dispositive motions due by January 3, 2025. First Status Report due by September 2, 2024. Second Status Report due by December 9, 2024. All further deadlines are set forth in the attached scheduling order. Note that some of the dates in the scheduling order differ from those proposed by the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/27/2023.(Piccolo, Marissa)
November 21, 2023 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blumberg, Michael)
October 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170 of Service of Court Orders in Removed Cases (Springer, George)
October 20, 2023 Filing 16 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., #14 Protective Order, #8 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., #13 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., #12 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., #11 Notice of Appearance filed by Linda McAlpine, #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Linda McAlpine, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., #9 Disclosure Statement, filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., 5 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2023.(Mendez, D)
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Thomas Gain on behalf of Linda McAlpine (Gain, Zachary)
October 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Levin Cameron on behalf of Linda McAlpine (Cameron, Pamela)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/19/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/19/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2023. Discovery due by 4/19/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 19, 2023 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2023. (Bozek, M.)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170 identifying Other Affiliate WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST for Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust; Other Affiliate Walmart Inc. for Walmart Inc.; Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Springer, George)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170 Statement Regarding Removed Cases (Springer, George)
October 19, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170 Pending Motions (Springer, George)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170 Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
October 19, 2023 Filing 5 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Blumberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170 (Blumberg, Michael)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170.(Springer, George)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170 (Springer, George)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust from New London, case number KNL-CV23-6063669-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7520957, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart Inc., Walmart Store #2170, Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust.(Springer, George)
October 19, 2023 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAlpine v. Walmart Store #2170 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda McAlpine
Represented By: Pamela Levin Cameron
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Gain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Store #2170
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?