Mahner v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Aaron Mahner
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc and Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01374
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vernon Dion Oliver
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Filing 24 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grey, Kelly)
November 22, 2023 Set Deadlines: The deadline for the parties to meet and confer to discuss the proposed discovery plan is extended until December 1, 2023. The deadline for the parties to file their 26(f) report is December 15, 2023 (Samson, Jessalyn) Modified on 11/22/2023 to edit docket text (Samson, Jessalyn).
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time Regarding 26(f) Report #20 . The deadline for the parties to meet and confer to discuss the proposed discovery plan is extended until December 1, 2023. The deadline for the parties to file their 26(f) report is December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 11/20/2023. (Rogers, Da'Shaun)
November 17, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Aaron Mahner. (Grey, Kelly)
November 16, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Andrew Kircher on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC (Kircher, Mark)
November 16, 2023 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to meet/discuss proposed discovery plan and file 26f report by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Sheehan, Cristin)
November 16, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy A. Alexejun on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC (Alexejun, Stacy)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stacy A. Alexejun. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2023. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark A. Kircher. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2023. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 9, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stacy A. Alexejun to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7545223) by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Sheehan, Cristin)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark A. Kircher to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7545198) by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. (Sheehan, Cristin)
November 9, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC.(Sheehan, Cristin)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 Stipulation: The parties' stipulation regarding amendment of case caption at Doc. #12 is So Ordered. Accordingly, the Clerk is respectfully directed to update the Case Caption to reflect the proper defendant as being Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 10/30/2023. (Dao, John)
October 24, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION re amendment of case caption by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc. (Sheehan, Cristin)
October 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly J Grey on behalf of Aaron Mahner (Grey, Kelly)
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc, #9 Protective Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc, 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc, #4 Disclosure Statement filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc Signed by Clerk on 10/20/23. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Pesta, J.)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Honorable Vernon D Oliver on 10/19/23.(Pesta, J.)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Honorable Vernon D Oliver on 10/19/23.(Pesta, J.)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/18/2023 Discovery due by 4/19/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2024 Signed by Clerk on 10/19/23.(Pesta, J.)
October 19, 2023 Honorable Vernon D Oliver and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
October 19, 2023 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/19/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 19, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristin E. Sheehan on behalf of Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc (Sheehan, Cristin)
October 19, 2023 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement ( HARLEY-DAVIDSON MOTOR COMPANY GROUP, LLC) by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc identifying Corporate Parent Harley-Davidson, Inc. for Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc. (Sheehan, Cristin)
October 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc re #1 Notice of Removal (statement pursuant to standing order) (Sheehan, Cristin)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc re #1 Notice of Removal (notice of no pending motions) (Sheehan, Cristin)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc from New Britain Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7521105, filed by Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc.(Sheehan, Cristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahner v. Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Mahner
Represented By: Kelly J Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Inc
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, LLC
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Represented By: Mark Andrew Kircher
Represented By: Stacy A. Alexejun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?