Giannotti v. Garlinghouse et al
Plaintiff: Mary Frances Giannotti
Defendant: Paul Garlinghouse, Paul A. Garlinghouse, Paul Arthur Garlinghouse, Internal Revenue Service, State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., City of New Haven, Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority and South Central Connecticut Regional Water Authority
Case Number: 3:2023cv01377
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Maria E Garcia
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 14 days after the Court rules on the United States' motion to dimiss to file a report pursuant to Local Rule 26(f) and as required by Court Order. See ECF No. 15 Order,,, by Internal Revenue Service. (Seitz, Lee)
December 14, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Garlinghouse on behalf of Paul Garlinghouse (Garlinghouse, Paul)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #20 Notice (Other) filed by Internal Revenue Service. The prefiling conference requirement is hereby waived. Defendant, Internal Revenue Service's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 18 is deemed filed as of 12/11/2023. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/13/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot #19 Motion for Prefiling Conference in light of the filing of ECF No. 20. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/13/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 12, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Internal Revenue Service of Letter Request for Prefiling Conference (Seitz, Lee)
December 12, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Prefiling Conference for United States' Motion to Dismiss by Internal Revenue Service. (Seitz, Lee)
December 11, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Internal Revenue Service.Responses due by 1/1/2024 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notices of Federal Tax Lien, #2 Exhibit - 2022 Lawsuit)(Seitz, Lee)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying without prejudice #16 Motion to Dismiss for failure to comply with the prefiling conference requirements. The prefiling conference requirements can be found at https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/content/robert-n-chatigny, Forms, scheduling order template, section 12. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/8/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 6, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Internal Revenue Service.Responses due by 12/27/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notices of Federal Tax Lien, #2 Exhibit - 2022 Lawsuit)(Seitz, Lee)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the parties' compliance with Local Rule 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) provides that, within 30 days after the appearance of any defendant, the attorneys of record and any unrepresented parties must confer for the purposes described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Local Rule 26(f) further provides that, within 14 days after the conference, the participants must jointly complete and file a report of the conference using Form 26(f). It appears that more than forty days have passed since the appearance of a defendant in this case, but no joint report has been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ordered that the parties file their required report on or before December 20, 2023. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/6/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 6, 2023 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to 12/6/2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/21/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 21, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Internal Revenue Service to 12/6/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 20, 2023 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 6, 2023 to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Granting Request)(Seitz, Lee)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Seitz on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (Seitz, Lee)
October 26, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services.(Launer, Krislyn)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Krislyn Mina Launer on behalf of State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services (Launer, Krislyn)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to November 22, 2023 to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/23/23. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 22, 2023 to Respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal by Internal Revenue Service. (Turbert, Julie)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Protective Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Internal Revenue Service, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Internal Revenue Service, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Internal Revenue Service Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Samson, Jessalyn)
October 23, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Internal Revenue Service to 11/22/2023. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/20/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/20/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2023. Discovery due by 4/20/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2023.(Samson, Jessalyn)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Internal Revenue Service re #1 Notice of Removal of No Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket)(Turbert, Julie)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of Internal Revenue Service (Turbert, Julie)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Internal Revenue Service from New Haven Superior Court, case number NNH-CV-23-6136577-S., filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint)(Turbert, Julie)
October 20, 2023 Judge Robert N. Chatigny and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giannotti v. Garlinghouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Garlinghouse
Represented By: Paul A. Garlinghouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Garlinghouse
Represented By: Paul A. Garlinghouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Arthur Garlinghouse
Represented By: Paul A. Garlinghouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Represented By: Lee Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Connecticut Department of Revenue Services
Represented By: Krislyn Mina Launer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Haven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater New Haven Water Pollution Control Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Central Connecticut Regional Water Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Frances Giannotti
Represented By: Michael Stone
Represented By: Michael Eric Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?