Getachew et al v. L&S Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: A. Mark Getachew and DeNora Getachew
Defendant: L&S Investments, LLC, Lawrence Rutkowski and Eric D. Grayson
Case Number: 3:2023cv01381
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time until Up To and Including February 26, 2023 (To Respond to Complaint) and February 9, 2023 (To File Joint Report re Rule 26(f) To File Response to Complaint/To File Joint Report re Rule 26(f) #1 Complaint. Counsel should understand, given the length of this extension, that the court does not expect a further motion for extension of time nor would it grant one. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/1/2023. (Sichanh, Christina)
December 1, 2023 Answer deadline updated for L&S Investments, LLC to 2/26/2024; Lawrence Rutkowski to 2/26/2024, Set Deadlines: (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/9/2024). (Sichanh, Christina)
November 29, 2023 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until Up To and Including February 26, 2023 (To Respond to Complaint) and February 9, 2023 (To File Joint Report re Rule 26(f) To File Response to Complaint/To File Joint Report re Rule 26(f) #1 Complaint by L&S Investments, LLC, Lawrence Rutkowski. (Palmer, Jennifer)
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan J. Ladd-Smith on behalf of A. Mark Getachew, DeNora Getachew (Ladd-Smith, Ivan)
October 26, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Eric D. Grayson waiver sent on 10/24/2023, answer due 12/23/2023 filed by A. Mark Getachew; DeNora Getachew. (Martini, Joseph)
October 26, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement L&S Investments, LLC's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by L&S Investments, LLC, Lawrence Rutkowski. (Palmer, Jennifer)
October 26, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Palmer on behalf of L&S Investments, LLC, Lawrence Rutkowski (Palmer, Jennifer)
October 26, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard P. Colbert on behalf of L&S Investments, LLC, Lawrence Rutkowski (Colbert, Richard)
October 26, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lawrence Rutkowski waiver sent on 10/25/2023, answer due 12/24/2023 filed by A. Mark Getachew; DeNora Getachew. (Martini, Joseph)
October 26, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to L&S Investments, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2023, answer due 12/24/2023 filed by A. Mark Getachew; DeNora Getachew. (Martini, Joseph)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eric D. Grayson, L&S Investments, LLC, Lawrence Rutkowski* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph W. Martini* *Spears Manning & Martini LLC* *2425 Post Road, Suite 203* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Freberg, B)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by DeNora Getachew, A. Mark Getachew, #6 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order, #1 Complaint filed by DeNora Getachew, A. Mark Getachew Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 23, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by A. Mark Getachew, DeNora Getachew. (Spears, Brian)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/20/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/20/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/20/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2023; Discovery due by 4/20/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2023.(Freberg, B)
October 20, 2023 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7522767.), filed by A. Mark Getachew, DeNora Getachew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Martini, Joseph)
October 20, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Eric D. Grayson, L&S Investments, LLC, Lawrence Rutkowski. (Martini, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Getachew et al v. L&S Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. Mark Getachew
Represented By: Joseph W. Martini
Represented By: Ivan J. Ladd-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeNora Getachew
Represented By: Joseph W. Martini
Represented By: Ivan J. Ladd-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&S Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Palmer
Represented By: Richard P. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Rutkowski
Represented By: Jennifer M. Palmer
Represented By: Richard P. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric D. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?