Valley Forge Insurance Company v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. and Ryobi Technologies Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv01382
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Cases associated. Create association to 3:23-cv-01228-RNC. (Gaskins, A)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Chatigny for all further proceedings. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/15/2023. (Ferguson, L.)
November 2, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. F. Niederer on behalf of One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. (Niederer, Eric)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement STATEMENT IN REMOVED CASES by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Niederer, Eric)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc..(Niederer, Eric)
October 25, 2023 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by Valley Forge Insurance Company. (Melley, William)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Melley, III on behalf of Valley Forge Insurance Company (Melley, William)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Protective Order, #3 Disclosure Statement, filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc. Signed by Clerk on 10/23/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/20/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/20/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2023. Discovery due by 4/20/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 20, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/23.(Hushin, Z.)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement 7.1 Corporate Disclosure by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Techtronic Industries, Co. Ltd. for Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.. (Niederer, Eric)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by One World Technologies, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc, TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Pending Motions (Niederer, Eric)
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc from Superior Court, J.D. of New Britain, case number HHB-CV-23-6081711-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7522821, filed by One World Technologies, Inc., TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc., Techtronic Industries North America, Inc., Ryobi Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Record, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Return of Service)(Niederer, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valley Forge Insurance Company v. Techtronic Industries North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Forge Insurance Company
Represented By: William J. Melley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techtronic Industries North America, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TTI Consumer Power Tools, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryobi Technologies Inc
Represented By: Eric W. F. Niederer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?