USA v. $68,066.93 in United States Currency et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $68,066.93 in United States Currency and $25,859.30 in United States Currency
Claimant: Michael Kramer and Adriana Jones
Case Number: 3:2023cv01419
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert M Spector
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to Michael Kramer (ECF No. #16 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. See ECF No. 21 . It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/28/23. (Eagan, O.)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The unopposed Motion to Set Aside Default (ECF No. #20 ) by claimant Michael Kramer is hereby GRANTED. The order entered by the Clerk pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a) as to Michael Kramer (ECF No. 15 ) is VACATED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/28/23. (Eagan, O.)
December 27, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Michael Kramer. (Klein, Gerald)
December 22, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #1 Complaint filed by Michael Kramer. (Klein, Gerald)
December 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald M. Klein on behalf of Michael Kramer (Klein, Gerald)
December 21, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Adriana Jones by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment)(Nelson, David)
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Michael Kramer by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Default Judgment)(Nelson, David)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as to Michael Kramer (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby GRANTED. Motion for default judgment due by 1/18/2024. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2023. (Ferguson, L.)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as to Adriana Jones (ECF No. #12 ) is hereby GRANTED. Motion for default judgment due by 1/18/2024. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/2023. (Ferguson, L.)
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Michael Kramer by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of 55a Default)(Nelson, David)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to Adriana Jones by USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of 55a Default)(Nelson, David)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN ON SERVICE by Publication filed by USA. Last publication date November 29, 2023. (Nelson, David)
December 7, 2023 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by USA (Nelson, David)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $68,066.93 in United States Currency; $25,859.30 in United States Currency Seized from CashApp Account. (Mendez, D)
November 7, 2023 Filing 8 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued (Ferguson, L.)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest In Rem (ECF No. #3 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/6/23. (Eagan, O.)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by USA, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/30/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/30/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Nelson, David)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $25,859.30 in United States Currency Seized from CashApp Account Number Ending -5484 held in the name of Michael Kramer, $68,066.93 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Nelson, David)
October 30, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $68,066.93 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $68,066.93 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,859.30 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Kramer
Represented By: Gerald M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adriana Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?