Burdzy v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janelle Burdzy
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. and Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2023cv01423
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2023 Set deadlines per #17 Scheduling Order: discovery due by 4-30-2024; dispositive motions due by 5-30-2024; and status report due by 1-30-2024 and 5-7-2024. (Shafer, J.)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by April 30, 2024. Dispositive motions due by May 30, 2024. First status report due January 30, 2024. Second status report due May 7, 2024. All further deadlines are set forth in the scheduling order. Note that some of the dates in the scheduling order differ from those proposed by the parties' Rule 26(f) report.. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/4/2023.(Piccolo, Marissa)
December 1, 2023 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Springer, George)
November 2, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. OF SERVICE OF COURT ORDERS IN REMOVED CASES (Springer, George)
November 2, 2023 Set deadline: Rule 26 meeting report due by 12-13-2023. (Shafer, J.)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Disclosure Statement, filed by Walmart, Inc., #11 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #12 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #4 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, 7 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #9 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, #10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/30/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 10/30/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2023. Discovery due by 4/30/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2023. (Mendez, D)
October 30, 2023 Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Caines on behalf of Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. (Caines, Eric)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership; Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Walmart, Inc.. (Springer, George)
October 30, 2023 Filing 7 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/30/2023.(Anastasio, F.)
October 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVED CASE (Springer, George)
October 30, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. OF PENDING MOTIONS (Springer, George)
October 30, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. CERTIFICATE OF FILING COPY OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT (Springer, George)
October 30, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. (Springer, George)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc. from New London, case number KNL-CV23-6063836-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7531862, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burdzy v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Burdzy
Represented By: Andrew B Ranks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Eric B. Caines
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Eric B. Caines
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?