Witt v. Chase et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Witt
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, Chase, Chase Bank, Experian, TransUnion, Equifax and Innovis
Case Number: 3:2023cv01449
Filed: November 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting MOTION for Extension of Time until January 11, 2024 file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Doc. #27 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/19/2023. (Lewis, D)
December 19, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/11/2024 (Lewis, D)
December 18, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 11, 2024 file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Chase Bank. (Rich, Brian)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT (Doc. #15 ). The Court GRANTS defendant Chase's unopposed motion for more definite statement. Plaintiff may file a supplemental pleading on or before January 5, 2024 that states the specifics of her claims against defendant Chase, including the causes of action she alleges, some level of factual basis for each, and the legal propriety of the relief requested. The failure to file a more definite statement as to Chase may result in dismissal of the complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/18/2023. (Lewis, D)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. #23 ). The Court DENIES plaintiff's motion to strike as moot and on the ground that the Court granted an extension of time on good cause shown. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/18/2023. (Lewis, D)
December 13, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE by Experian to Self Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss (Rubin, Ann)
December 11, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike Extension of Time and Opposition to Referral to Magistrate Judge by Wendy Witt.Responses due by 1/1/2024 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Chartier, A.)
November 30, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Experian.Responses due by 12/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint)(Rubin, Ann)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2023 to File Initial Responsive Pleading (Doc. #19 ). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/13/2023. (Lewis, D)
November 9, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Experian of Consent to Removal to District Court (Rubin, Ann)
November 9, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/30/2023 to File Initial Responsive Pleading by Experian. (Rubin, Ann)
November 9, 2023 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement by Experian identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate CENTRAL SOURCE LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian. (Rubin, Ann)
November 9, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann H. Rubin on behalf of Experian (Rubin, Ann)
November 9, 2023 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Chase Bank. (Rich, Brian)
November 9, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Chase Bank.Responses due by 11/30/2023 (Rich, Brian)
November 8, 2023 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/18/2023 (Lewis, D)
November 7, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chase Bank (Rich, Brian)
November 6, 2023 Filing 13 Docket Entry Correction re #12 Electronic Service Documents. PDF of Standing Order on Removed Cases added. (Chartier, A)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #11 Protective Order, #4 Notice of Compliance with Pretrial Order, 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Notice of Appearance, #2 Disclosure Statement, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2023.(Chartier, A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2023: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Chartier, A).
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE by Chase Bank Certificate of Removal (Rich, Brian)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Chase Bank of Removal To Adverse Parties (Rich, Brian)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/2/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 11/2/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2024 Discovery due by 5/3/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 6/7/2024 Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2023.(Perez, J.)
November 2, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)
November 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Rich on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank (Rich, Brian)
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PRETRIAL ORDER by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Rich, Brian)
November 2, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank (Rich, Brian)
November 2, 2023 Filing 2 First Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank. (Rich, Brian)
November 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank from Connecticut Superior Court, case number KNL-CV23-5024673-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7536640, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, Complaint and Return of Service)(Rich, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witt v. Chase et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Represented By: Ann H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Witt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?