Speer v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Sheri Speer
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01492
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Reply to Objection to Motion for Remand, filed by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Mendez, D)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot #19 Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's motion for extension of time. Pursuant to the Court's order at ECF No. 20, the Court will set deadlines for Defendant to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint and the parties' 26(f) report after its decision on Plaintiff's motion to remand, if necessary. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/14/2023. (Piccolo, Marissa)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. As Plaintiff has filed a motion to remand, Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint and the parties' deadline to file a 26(f) repot are vacated, pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/14/2023.(Piccolo, Marissa)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 22, 2024 and January 29, 2024 To Answer Or Otherwise Plead and File Rule 26(f) Meeting Report Set Deadlines/Hearings by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Menge, Christa)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition and in Response to Objection to Response to OSC re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Citizenship, #2 Exhibit B- Shandle Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C- Demand)(Menge, Christa)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Defendant may respond to ECF No. 16, Plaintiff's objection to its response to the Court's order corroborating the amount in controversy, as part of its opposition to Plaintiff's motion to remand due December 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 12/5/2023.(Piccolo, Marissa)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OBJECTION To Defendant's re #14 Response, filed by Sheri Speer. (Mendez, D)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's motion to remand by December 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/29/2023.(Piccolo, Marissa)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Set deadline as to #13 MOTION for Remand: response due by 12-12-2023 per Dkt. 15 Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE re 11 Order, Corroborating Amount in Controversy filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Menge, Christa)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion for Remand filed by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Mendez, D) Corrected event on 11-29-2023 (Shafer, J.).
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Set deadline: records corroborating amount in controversy due by 11-22-2023 per Dkt. 11 Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Answer deadline updated to 12-20-2023 per Dkt. 12 Order. (Shafer, J.)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company's motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by December 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/15/2023. (Piccolo, Marissa)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Defendant represents that the current unpaid principal balance due on the mortgage for the property at issue is $85,211.24, which is the basis for Defendant claiming that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000. So that the Court can be assured of its subject matter jurisdiction, Defendant shall file, by November 22, 2023, records corroborating that figure. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/15/2023.(Piccolo, Marissa)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Set deadline: Rule 26(f) meeting report due by 12-27-2023. (Shafer, J.)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Amended Disclosure Statement for Diversity Jurisdiction by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Menge, Christa)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order on Removed Cases. Signed by Clerk on 11-14-2023. (Shafer, J.)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Disclosure Statement, #3 First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2023, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Electronic Filing Order, Dkt. 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Standing Protective Order, and #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Clerk on 11-14-2023. (Shafer, J.)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11-13-2023. (Shafer, J.)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11-13-2023. (Shafer, J.)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: amended pleadings due by 1-12-2024, discovery due by 5-14-2024, and dispositive motions due by 6-18-2024. Signed by Clerk on 11-13-2023. (Shafer, J.)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Menge, Christa)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 First MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2023 To Answer Or Otherwise Plead by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Menge, Christa)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/13/23.(Hushin, Z.)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company from Connecticut Superior Court, case number KNL-CV23-6063574-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7546063, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B- State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C- Notice to File in State Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Menge, Christa) Modified on 11/13/2023 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speer v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Christa Menge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?