Alicea v. Dooley
Plaintiff: Maria Mercedes Alicea
Defendant: Kari A. Dooley
Case Number: 3:2023cv01531
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Robert A Richardson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kari A. Dooley. (Suvari, Catherine)
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 Consent to Electronic Notice by Maria Mercedes Alicea (Barry, L)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to Superior Court on Wanton & Callateral Estoppel by Maria Mercedes Alicea. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Barry, L)
December 26, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand/ Failure to Withdrawal Within Time Frame Motion to Return to Superior Court by Maria Mercedes Alicea. (Barry, L)
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Kari A. Dooley re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss (pursuant to Local Rule 12(a) (Suvari, Catherine)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss by Kari A. Dooley.Responses due by 1/11/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Suvari, Catherine)
November 27, 2023 Filing 10 OBJECTION to Transfer filed by Maria Mercedes Alicea. (Barry, L)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kari A. Dooley Initial Case Management Orders (Suvari, Catherine)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kari A. Dooley Signed by Clerk on 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Barry, L)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/21/2023.(Barry, L)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/21/2023.(Barry, L)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/20/2024 Discovery due by 5/22/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2024 Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2023.(Barry, L)
November 21, 2023 Judge Victor A. Bolden and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Freberg, B)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/21/23.(Hushin, Z.)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 21, 2023 to Move or otherwise respond by Kari A. Dooley. (Suvari, Catherine)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party by Kari A. Dooley. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Suvari, Catherine)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kari A. Dooley from Connecticut Superior Court, case number FBT-CV23-5053118-S., filed by Kari A. Dooley.(Suvari, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alicea v. Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Mercedes Alicea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari A. Dooley
Represented By: Catherine Suvari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?