Rodriguez v. Doherty et al
Plaintiff: Amauri Rodriguez
Defendant: Daniel Doherty, Batten, F. Saleh, Rodriguez, Acanto, John Doe, Joshua Appuzo, Vivian Martell, Diane Campbell-Hooks, Marybeth Moure-Williams and Henry Mushi
Case Number: 3:2023cv01542
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Docket Entry Correction re Set Deadlines/Hearings. Dispositive Motion deadline modified to indicate error, docketed on the wrong case. Terminated deadline. (Jacques, Djess)
January 24, 2024 ENTERED IN ERROR Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2024. (Jacques, Djess) Modified on 1/24/2024 (Jacques, Djess).
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A plaintiff in a civil case is not entitled to appointment of counsel on request and the Second Circuit repeatedly cautions against the routine appointment of counsel. See, e.g., Hendricks v. Coughlin, 114 F.3d 390, 393 (2d Cir. 1997); Cooper v. A. Sargenti Co., 877 F.2d 170, 172 (2d Cir. 1989). Insofar as volunteer lawyer time is not always readily available, a plaintiff seeking appointment of counsel must show first that he "sought counsel and has been unable to obtain it." McDonald v. Head Criminal Court Supervisor Officer, 850 F.2d 121, 123 (2d Cir. 1988). Once a plaintiff has made this showing, he must then demonstrate that his complaint passes the test of "likely merit." Cooper, 877 F.2d at 173. He must demonstrate that the claims in the complaint have a sufficient basis to justify appointing a volunteer lawyer to pursue them. Notably, "even where a claim is not frivolous, counsel is often unwarranted where the [plaintiff's] chances of success are extremely slim." Id. at 171. Here, Plaintiff has demonstrated that he has sought but has, as of yet, been unable to obtain counsel. However, at this nascent stage of the litigation, the Court cannot ascertain the "likely merit" of Plaintiff's claims. Indeed, the complaint is currently undergoing review pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915. The #11 Motion is therefore DENIED without prejudice should facts develop through the litigation that permit reassessment of this issue.Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/27/2023. (Chambers, Jillian)
December 21, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Amauri Rodriguez. (Fanelle, N.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Amauri Rodriguez. (Fanelle, N.)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 11/28/2023. (Corriette, M.)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/27/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 Standing Order re: Prisoner Case Discovery. Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R Underhill on 11/27/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/27/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/27/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
November 27, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 27, 2023 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Amauri Rodriguez. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amauri Rodriguez. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acanto, Joshua Appuzo, Batten, Diane Campbell-Hooks, John Doe(#5 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#1 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#7 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#3 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#6 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#8 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#9 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#2 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#4 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), Daniel Doherty, Vivian Martell, Marybeth Moure-Williams, Henry Mushi, Rodriguez, F. Saleh, filed by Amauri Rodriguez.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 27, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Acanto, Joshua Appuzo, Batten, Diane Campbell-Hooks, John Doe(#5 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#1 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#7 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#3 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#6 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#8 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#9 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#2 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), John Doe(#4 Corrections Officer individually and in their Official capacities), Daniel Doherty, Vivian Martell, Marybeth Moure-Williams, Henry Mushi, Rodriguez, F. Saleh. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 27, 2023 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Doherty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amauri Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Appuzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Martell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Campbell-Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marybeth Moure-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Mushi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?