Massie v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Ronald Massie
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2023cv01548
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vernon Dion Oliver
Referring Judge: Vernon D Oliver
2 Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Court has been made aware that Plaintiff served a summons with his original complaint upon Wells Fargo on December 18, 2023. See ECF No. [19-1] at 1. Accordingly, Plaintiff is ordered to file proof of service on the docket by February 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 1/24/2024. (Lapsia, Tina)
January 24, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association to Self-Represented Litigants Regarding Motions to Dismiss as required by Local Rule 12(a) (Higgins, Sean)
January 24, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.Responses due by 2/14/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Higgins, Sean)
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Wells Fargo Bank, National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Ronald Massie* *421 Mansfield Avenue* *Darien, CT 06820*. (Imbriani, Susan)
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE: The self-represented plaintiff shall proceed with service upon the defendant(s) pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and may refer to pages 8-11 of the Court's Guide for Self-Represented Parties found on our website here: https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/rules-and-forms. If service is not effected by 4/15/2024, the case will be subject to dismissal. Dismissal due by 4/15/2024. Signed by Clerk on 1/16/2024.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed by Ronald Massie.(Gaskins, A)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying MOTION for Order for Proof of Authority to Represent #13 : Counsel has entered an appearance on behalf of Defendant; therefore, the Court assumes that counsel has authority to represent Defendant. See In re Gasser, 104 F. 537, 538 (8th Cir. 1900) ("The appearance in court of an attorney at law licensed to practice there carries with it the presumption of authority to appear and act for his client in the proceeding in which he seeks to represent him. His mere appearance is prima facie evidence that he is duly authorized to represent and act for his client[.]"); Restatement (Third) of the Law Governing Lawyers 37 PFD No. 1 (1996) ("A lawyer who enters an appearance before a tribunal for a person is presumed to represent that person in the proceeding in question.").Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 12/27/2023. (Lapsia, Tina)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 OBJECTION re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 23, 2024 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Massie. (Gaskins, A)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Order for Proof of Authority to Represent by Ronald Massie. (Gaskins, A)
December 21, 2023 Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/5/2024 (Samson, Jessalyn)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying Motion for Extension of Time #11 : Defendant's motion of time to respond to the Complaint is denied as the Complaint has not yet been served on the defendant.Having reviewed the Complaint and Defendant's motion, however, the Court admonishes Plaintiff for his inclusion of derogatory language and the suggestive photograph in the Complaint, and for threatening the defendant that the litigation may become "unpleasant." The Court orders the Clerk to seal the Complaint to remove it from the public docket, and orders Plaintiff to refile his Complaint without any photographs and with appropriate language by January 5, 2024. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case.The Court further warns Plaintiff that, should this action continue, any further use of derogatory, threatening, and/or inappropriate language against Defendant or in filings before this Court may result in sanctions, including monetary fines and/or dismissal of the action. See Sassower v. Field, 973 F.2d 75, 80-81 (2d Cir. 1992) (holding that federal district courts have "inherent authority to sanction parties appearing before [them] for acting in bad faith, vexatiously, wantonly, or for oppressive reasons"); see also Koehl v. Bernstein, 740 F.3d 860 (2d Cir. 2014) (upholding district court's sanction dismissing pro se plaintiff's lawsuit); Schottenstein v. Lee, No. 22cv1197 (DLC), 2023 BL 448383 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 11, 2023) (imposing monetary sanctions on attorney who filed nude photographs on public docket); Komatsu v. City of New York, No. 18 CIV. 3698 (LGS), 2021 WL 4427015, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Sept. 27, 2021) (dismissing pro se complaint pursuant to court's inherent power for repeated use of degrading and foul language). It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 12/20/2023.(Lapsia, Tina)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 23, 2024 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; email)(Higgins, Sean)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Higgins, Sean)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (Higgins, Sean)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Wells Fargo Bank, National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Ronald Massie* *421 Mansfield Avenue* *Darien, CT 06820*. (Imbriani, Susan)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE: The self-represented plaintiff shall proceed with service upon the defendant(s) pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and may refer to pages 8-11 of the Court's Guide for Self-Represented Parties found on our website here: https://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/rules-and-forms. If service is not effected by 2/28/2024, the case will be subject to dismissal. Dismissal due by 2/28/2024. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Ronald Massie, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon Dion Oliver on 11/29/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon Dion Oliver on 11/29/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2024, Discovery due by 5/30/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 7/4/2024. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/29/2023. (Oliver, T.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, filed by Ronald Massie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oliver, T.)
November 29, 2023 Filing fee received from Ronald Massie: $ 402.00, receipt number BPT14037 (Oliver, T.)
November 29, 2023 Judge Vernon Dion Oliver and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)
November 29, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massie v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Massie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?