Panancherry et al v. Mehta et al
Plaintiff: Pratheesan Panancherry and Jeffrey Bastress
Defendant: Vimal Mehta, Richard I Steinhart, Peter Mueller, June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Michael Miller, Michal Votruba and Krishnan Nandabalan
Nominal Defendant: BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01554
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meryn C. N. Grant to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7628068) by BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Krishnan Nandabalan, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meryn C. N. Grant)(West, Taylor)
January 26, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah A. Tomkowiak to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7628065) by BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Krishnan Nandabalan, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah A. Tomkowiak)(West, Taylor)
January 26, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Colleen C. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7628064) by BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Krishnan Nandabalan, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colleen C. Smith)(West, Taylor)
January 26, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michele D. Johnson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7628063) by BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Krishnan Nandabalan, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michele D. Johnson)(West, Taylor)
January 26, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor West on behalf of Krishnan Nandabalan (West, Taylor)
January 25, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mary Ellen Connor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7626068) by Jeffrey Bastress, Pratheesan Panancherry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Whitcomb, Jonathan)
January 25, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/31/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Dial-in instructions have been emailed to counsel of record. Anyone wishing to observe this proceeding should contact chambers at 860-240-3224 to request the dial-in instructions. (Vascotto, J.)
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING STAY OF ACTION by Jeffrey Bastress, Pratheesan Panancherry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whitcomb, Jonathan)
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc.. (West, Taylor)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor West on behalf of BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba (West, Taylor)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Krishnan Nandabalan, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney * Jonathan P. Whitcomb* *Diserio Martin O'Connor & Castiglioni LLP* *1010 Washington Boulevard Suite 800* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Mendez, D)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Pratheesan Panancherry, Jeffrey Bastress, #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Pratheesan Panancherry, Jeffrey Bastress, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Pratheesan Panancherry, Jeffrey Bastress, #6 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Notice re: Disclosure Statement. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2023. (Mendez, D)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/28/2023. (Mendez, D)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/28/2023. (Mendez, D)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/27/202. Discovery due by 5/29/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2024. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2023. (Mendez, D)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/23.(Hushin, Z.)
November 28, 2023 Judge Alvin W. Thompson and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Volpe on behalf of Jeffrey Bastress, Pratheesan Panancherry (Volpe, Christina)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey Bastress, Pratheesan Panancherry. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Krishnan Nandabalan, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7563210.), filed by Jeffrey Bastress, Pratheesan Panancherry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification of Pratheensan Panancherry, #3 Verification of Jeffrey Bastress)(Whitcomb, Jonathan)
November 28, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc., June Bray, Sandeep Laumas, Vimal Mehta, Michael Miller, Peter Mueller, Krishnan Nandabalan, Richard I Steinhart, Michal Votruba. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panancherry et al v. Mehta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pratheesan Panancherry
Represented By: Christina Volpe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Represented By: Christina Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bastress
Represented By: Christina Volpe
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Represented By: Christina Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vimal Mehta
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard I Steinhart
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Mueller
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Bray
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeep Laumas
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Miller
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michal Votruba
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krishnan Nandabalan
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: BioXcel Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?