McGlone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Adrienne McGlone
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2023cv01556
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/29/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Maria E. Garcia. The parties will call the Chamber's Conference Line at: (888) 557-8511; Access Code: 3852222# (Esposito, A.)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER.The Government having filed the administrative record on January 23, 2024 the Court hereby enters the following Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand and supporting memorandum of law no later than February 22, 2024. Defendant shall then have until Mach 23, 2024 to file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand. Within 14 days after Defendant files its motion, Plaintiff may file a reply pursuant to Local Rule 7(d).Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, the parties are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether a reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate.The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Order which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions and supporting memoranda. In addition to complying with these requirements, memoranda should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case.Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above, in the Standing Order, and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion.Any motion for extension of a deadline must comply with the Social Security Standing Order and Local Rule 7(b)(2) and must be filed at least three (3) days before the existing deadline.SO ORDERED at New Haven, Connecticut.Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 1/24/24. (Esposito, A.)
January 23, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE by Commissioner of Social Security of the Filing of the Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unofficial text-searchable copy of Certified Administrative Record)(Razel, Timothy)
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 Social Security Transcripts. (Razel, Timothy)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing. Self-Represented Filers are Required to Comply with the Standard Electronic Filing Order Docketed at Case Opening. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 12/19/2023. (Garcia, Maria)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security, Adrienne McGlone. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/19/2023.(Maturo, F.)
December 15, 2023 Filing 16 Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Adrienne McGlone (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
December 15, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Adrienne McGlone. (Peterson, M)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 Consent to Electronic Notice by Adrienne McGlone (Peterson, M)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REMINDER: Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Maturo, F.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security (Razel, Timothy)
December 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Razel on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Razel, Timothy)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, along with a financial affidavit. Plaintiff has fully completed the required information. She asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that Plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Court has also reviewed the Complaint, ECF No. 1, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and finds the claim is sufficient to proceed to service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 11/30/23. (Esposito, A.)
November 29, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE to Self-represented Parties. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 11/27/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 11/27/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adrienne McGlone. (Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Adrienne McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Part 2)(Chartier, A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2023: #2 Envelope) (Chartier, A).
November 27, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Commissioner of Social Security to 1/27/2024. (Chartier, A)
November 27, 2023 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrienne McGlone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy A Razel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?