James v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Darryl James
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi and Martin O'Malley
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2023cv01563
Filed: November 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Sarala V Nagala
2 Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383 Review of SSA Decision SSID - SSI Disability Cases
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Commissioner having filed the administrative record (ECF No. 13), the Court hereby orders as follows:Plaintiff shall file a motion to reverse and/or remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before February 25, 2024. Defendant shall file a motion to affirm or a motion for voluntary remand, supporting memorandum of law, and statement of material facts on or before March 26, 2024. Plaintiff may file a reply brief pursuant to Local Rule 7(d) on or before April 9, 2024.Prior to the filing of any dispositive motions, counsel are encouraged to confer regarding the merits of the case in an effort to determine whether reversal and voluntary remand are appropriate.The Court reminds the parties of the previously filed Standing Scheduling Order, ECF No. 12, which sets forth page limits and form and content requirements for motions, supporting memoranda, and statements of materials facts. The parties should avoid boilerplate discussions of the governing legal standards as the Court is familiar with the standard of review and the sequential evaluation process employed in the analysis of Social Security disability applications. The parties should focus on informing the Court of relevant and controlling legal authority and applying it to the facts of this case.Motions filed by the parties must comply with the requirements set forth above and in the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to comply may result in denial of the motion. Subject to the provisions of Local Rule 7(b)3, either party may move for a first Extension of Time to file the partys dispositive motion and brief, for a period not to exceed 30 days without a showing of good cause, provided the consent of the opposing party is obtained. All other Motions for Extension of Time must be filed in accordance with Local Rule 7(b). Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/26/2024.(Piccolo, Marissa)
January 25, 2024 Filing 13 Social Security Transcripts. (Molinaro, John)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. On December 20, 2023, Martin O'Malley replaced Kilolo Kijakazi as Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Martin O'Malley for Kilolo Kijakazi in this action. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 1/22/2024.(Piccolo, Marissa)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Sarala V. Nagala for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 1/19/2024.(Maturo, F.)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REMINDER: Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Maturo, F.)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Molinaro on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Molinaro, John)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, along with a financial affidavit. Plaintiff has fully completed the required information. Plaintiff asserts that Plaintiff is unable to afford to pay fees and costs. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that Plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Court has also reviewed the Complaint (ECF No. 1) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and finds the claim is sufficient to proceed to service of process on the defendant.Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 12/4/23. (Cabral, Donald)
December 1, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, A)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 11/30/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 11/30/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 11/30/2023.(Chartier, A)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 11/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Chartier, A)
November 30, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Kilolo Kijakazi to 1/30/2024. (Chartier, A)
November 30, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darryl James. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Yelner, Olia)
November 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, Social Security Administration, filed by Darryl James.(Yelner, Olia)
November 30, 2023 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl James
Represented By: Olia Yelner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: John Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: John Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?