Vega v. State of Connecticut Department of Correction
Plaintiff: Maria Cruz Vega
Defendant: State of Connecticut Department of Correction
Case Number: 3:2023cv01572
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vernon Dion Oliver
Referring Judge: Vernon D Oliver
2 Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 Status Report: The parties request to defer briefing on the anticipated motion to dismiss in light of settlement discussions and Plaintiff's intention to amend the complaint. The request is granted. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding their intended next steps by February 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 1/26/2024. (Dao, John)
January 25, 2024 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT responding to this Court's order at ECF No. 20 by Maria Cruz Vega. (Taubes, Alexander)
January 24, 2024 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/30/2024; Status Reports due by 6/28/2024 and 10/7/2024 (Samson, Jessalyn)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #16 : By January 30, 2024, Defendant shall confer with Plaintiff and file a letter regarding a proposed briefing schedule for the anticipated motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 1/23/2024.(Dao, John)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Report #18 is approved as amended. Discovery due by September 30, 2024. The parties shall take the first step to initiate any dispositive motion practice by August 30, 2024. Status reports due on June 28, 2024 and October 7, 2024. Signed by Judge Vernon Dion Oliver on 01/23/2024.(Dao, John)
January 12, 2024 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Valentine, Colleen)
December 27, 2023 Filing 17 Security for Costs in the amount of $500 posted by Maria Cruz Vega. Receipt Number 27991 (Barry, L)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION Letter Brief Requesting Pre-Filing Conference To File Motion to Dismiss by State of Connecticut Department of Correction.Responses due by 1/12/2024 (Valentine, Colleen)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date. Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2023. (Imbriani, Susan)
December 6, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Security for Costs by State of Connecticut Department of Correction. (Valentine, Colleen)
December 5, 2023 Answer deadline updated for State of Connecticut Department of Correction to 1/9/2024. (Samson, Jessalyn)
December 4, 2023 Filing fee received from Colleen Valentine: $ 405.00, agency tracking number 76568538640 (Ruocco, M.)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time #5 : The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint #1 is extended to January 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Vernon D. Oliver on 12/04/2023. (Dao, John)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 Docket Entry Correction re #11 Electronic Service Documents - Standing order on removed cases has been attached. (Imbriani, Susan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by State of Connecticut Department of Correction, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice (Other) filed by State of Connecticut Department of Correction, #5 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2024 to File a Responsive Pleading filed by State of Connecticut Department of Correction, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State of Connecticut Department of Correction, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Standing Protective Order, #10 Notice, #4 Notice (Other) filed by State of Connecticut Department of Correction Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023.(Imbriani, Susan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2023: #1 Standing Order on removed cases) (Imbriani, Susan).
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Imbriani, Susan)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon Dion Oliver on 12/1/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vernon Dion Oliver on 12/1/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2024, Discovery due by 6/1/2024, Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2024. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023.(Imbriani, Susan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/23.(Hushin, Z.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 9, 2024 to File a Responsive Pleading by State of Connecticut Department of Correction. (Valentine, Colleen)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by State of Connecticut Department of Correction STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Notice to Counsel)(Valentine, Colleen)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by State of Connecticut Department of Correction NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS (Valentine, Colleen)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen B Valentine on behalf of State of Connecticut Department of Correction (Valentine, Colleen)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Connecticut Department of Correction from Superior Court of Hartford, case number HHD-CV23-6176691-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7567333, filed by State of Connecticut Department of Correction. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons, #2 State Court Complaint)(Valentine, Colleen)
December 1, 2023 Judge Vernon Dion Oliver and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega v. State of Connecticut Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cruz Vega
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Connecticut Department of Correction
Represented By: Colleen B Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?