Speer v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sheri Speer
Defendant: Trans Union LLC, Fay Servicing, LLC, Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC and Rushmore Servicing
Case Number: 3:2023cv01573
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Referring Judge: Robert M Spector
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/11/2024 03:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. (Lewis, D)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Conference (Doc. #17 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by January 10, 2025, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by January 31, 2025, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by March 3, 2025. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by April 30, 2025, or within 45 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on October 11, 2024 at 3:00 p.m.. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/18/2024.(Lewis, D)
January 16, 2024 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Trifon, Tara)
January 16, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker on behalf of Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Rushmore Servicing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosure statement)(Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 Docket Entry Correction re Set Deadlines/Hearings; entry modified to reflect the wrong deadline was set. (Lewis, D)
January 9, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/16/2024 (Lewis, D)
January 9, 2024 ENTERED IN ERROR - Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 1/16/2024 (Lewis, D) Modified on 1/9/2024 (Lewis, D).
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew G. Hope. Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/19/2024. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/2023. (Chartier, A.)
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew G. Hope to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7589729) by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Janow, Jonathan)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lynn Trifon on behalf of Fay Servicing, LLC (Trifon, Tara)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Trans Union LLC.(Janow, Jonathan)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Trans Union LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Janow, Jonathan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Trans Union LLC, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Trans Union LLC, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Trans Union LLC, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Trans Union LLC, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Chartier, A)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/1/2023.(Chartier, A)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/1/2023.(Chartier, A)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2024 Discovery due by 6/1/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2024 Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023.(Chartier, A)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Trans Union LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (No Pending Motions) (Janow, Jonathan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan D. Janow on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Janow, Jonathan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC. (Janow, Jonathan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023.(Maturo, F.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union LLC from Sup. Ct. Judicial District of New London, case number TBD. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7567601, filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Janow, Jonathan)
December 1, 2023 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speer v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Janow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Tara Lynn Trifon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Servicing
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?