Clay v. FGO Logistics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John J. Clay, Jr.
Defendant: FGO Logistics, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation and Christopher Soldi
Case Number: 3:2023cv01575
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Referring Judge: S Dave Vatti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Set Deadlines as to #25 MOTION Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings , #23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings, #24 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Responses due by 2/29/2024 (Johnson, D.)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The #26 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the pending motions to compel arbitration and stay proceedings by February 29, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/16/2024. (Bassali, David)
January 12, 2024 Filing 26 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 29, 2024 to Plead by John J. Clay, Jr. (Wolfson, John)
January 8, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Christopher Soldi.Responses due by 1/29/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Varga, Douglas)
January 8, 2024 Filing 24 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Costco Wholesale Corporation.Responses due by 1/29/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law of Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Califano, Anthony)
January 8, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by FGO Logistics, Inc..Responses due by 1/29/2024 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF BARRETT WOLF, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Affidavit, #4 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF DEFENDANT FGO DELIVERS, LLC (IMPROPERLY NAMED AS FGO LOGISTICS, INC.) IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROCEEDINGS)(Gallanty, Alan)
December 28, 2023 Filing 22 First MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Outcome of Anticipated Motions to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Joint Motion by Costco Wholesale Corporation, FGO Logistics, Inc., Christopher Soldi, John J. Clay, Jr.Responses due by 1/18/2024 (Califano, Anthony)
December 11, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Wattenmaker on behalf of John J. Clay, Jr (Wattenmaker, Benjamin)
December 11, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by John J. Clay, Jr Plaintiff's Statement of Compliance with the Court's Standing Order on Removed Cases (Wolfson, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Wolfson on behalf of John J. Clay, Jr (Wolfson, John)
December 5, 2023 Answer deadline updated for Costco Wholesale Corporation to 1/8/2024; FGO Logistics, Inc. to 1/8/2024; Christopher Soldi to 1/8/2024. (Johnson, D.)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The #15 motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by January 8, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/5/2023. (Bassali, David)
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Christopher Soldi Statement of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Varga, Douglas)
December 4, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Varga on behalf of Christopher Soldi (Varga, Douglas)
December 4, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 8, 2024 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation, FGO Logistics, Inc., Christopher Soldi. (Califano, Anthony)
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT FGO DELIVERS, LLC by FGO Logistics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Need it Now Delivers, LLC for FGO Logistics, Inc.. (Gallanty, Alan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by FGO Logistics, Inc. Statement of Compliance with the Court's Standing Order on Removed Cases (Gallanty, Alan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Gallanty on behalf of FGO Logistics, Inc. (Gallanty, Alan)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Disclosure Statement filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #8 Electronic Filing Order, 6 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #9 Protective Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, FGO Logistics, Inc., Christopher Soldi, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, FGO Logistics, Inc., Christopher Soldi, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, #10 Notice, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 12/01/2023. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment) (Peterson, M)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/01/2023. (Peterson, M)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/01/2023. (Peterson, M)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2024. Discovery due by 6/1/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2024. Signed by Clerk on 12/01/2023. (Peterson, M)
December 1, 2023 Filing 6 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/1/2023.(Maturo, F.)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation Statement of Compliance with the Court's Standing Order on Removed Cases (Califano, Anthony)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Costco Wholesale Corporation, FGO Logistics, Inc., Christopher Soldi of No Pending Motions (Califano, Anthony)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Califano, Anthony)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S. Califano on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Califano, Anthony)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Christopher Soldi, Costco Wholesale Corporation, FGO Logistics, Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of Hartford, case number HDD-CV23-6176412-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7567801, filed by Christopher Soldi, Costco Wholesale Corporation, FGO Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents Served on FGO Logistics, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents Served on Christopher Soldi, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Documents Served on Costco Wholesale Corporation, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Califano, Anthony)
December 1, 2023 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clay v. FGO Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Clay, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Wolfson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Wattenmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FGO Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Alan Gallanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Anthony S. Califano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Soldi
Represented By: Douglas J. Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?