State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Garcia K Anderson, Megan K Maczuga, Patricia Maczuga, United States of America, Garcia K. Anderson, Megan K. Maczuga and USA
Case Number: 3:2023cv01605
Filed: December 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Referring Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. USA served on 12/20/2023, answer due 2/18/2024. (Spadaccini, Louis)
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Megan K. Maczuga served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Spadaccini, Louis)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Patricia Maczuga served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Spadaccini, Louis)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Garcia K. Anderson served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Spadaccini, Louis)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Spadaccini, Louis)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Megan K. Maczuga, Patricia Maczuga* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Louis Anthony Spadaccini* *Blackwell, Davis & Spadaccini, LLC* *158 East Center Street* *Manchester, CT 06040*. (Fanelle, N.)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Garcia K. Anderson, USA* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Louis Anthony Spadaccini* *Blackwell, Davis & Spadaccini, LLC* *158 East Center Street* *Manchester, CT 06040*. (Fanelle, N.)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, #5 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
December 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/9/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
December 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/9/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
December 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2024 Discovery due by 6/9/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2024 Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2023. (Fanelle, N.)
December 9, 2023 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2023.(Perez, J.)
December 9, 2023 Judge Kari A. Dooley and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
December 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7577172.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spadaccini, Louis)
December 9, 2023 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Spadaccini, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Louis Anthony Spadaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia K Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan K Maczuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Maczuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan K. Maczuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?