Streater v. Greene et al
Plaintiff: Maceo Troy Streater and Maceo T. Streater
Defendant: Joseph Greene, City of New Haven, Chief of Police Nicholas Pastore, Robert Lawlor, Vincent Raucci, Detective Vaughn Maher, Nicholas Pastore, Robert Lawlor, Jr. and Vaughn Maher
Case Number: 3:2024cv00004
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Maria E Garcia
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Williams on behalf of Nicholas Pastore (Williams, James)
February 28, 2024 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Vincent Raucci* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander T. Taubes* *470 James Street* *Suite 007* *New Haven, CT 06513*. (Oliver, T.)
February 27, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Roland Ouellette on behalf of Nicholas Pastore (Ouellette, Scott)
February 27, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Vincent Raucci. (Taubes, Alexander)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Stone on behalf of City of New Haven (Stone, Amanda)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of City of New Haven (Gerarde, Thomas)
February 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristan M. Maccini on behalf of Joseph Greene (Maccini, Kristan)
February 23, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 4/8/2024. (Khabbaz, D)
February 22, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Melley, III on behalf of Robert Lawlor, Jr, Vaughn Maher (Melley, William)
January 3, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Maceo T. Streater, #4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2024. (Oliver, T.)
January 2, 2024 Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/2/2024. (Oliver, T.)
January 2, 2024 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/2/2024. (Oliver, T.)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2024 Discovery due by 7/3/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 8/7/2024 Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2024. (Oliver, T.)
January 2, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/24.(Hushin, Z.)
January 2, 2024 Senior District Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Maria E. Garcia added. (Oliver, T.)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7599041.), filed by Maceo T. Streater.(Taubes, Alexander) Modified on 1/3/2024 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streater v. Greene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maceo Troy Streater
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maceo T. Streater
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Greene
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Haven
Represented By: Amanda Stone
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Nicholas Pastore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lawlor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Raucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Vaughn Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Pastore
Represented By: James G. Williams
Represented By: Scott Roland Ouellette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lawlor, Jr.
Represented By: William J. Melley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn Maher
Represented By: William J. Melley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?