Porta v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alfredo Porta
Defendant: Exactech, Inc., Exactech U.S., Inc., TPG, Inc., Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Michael Laczkowski and TPG Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00009
Filed: January 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2024 Filing 30 Docket Entry Correction: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report deadline ENTERED IN ERROR. (Reis, Julia)
February 5, 2024 ENTERED IN ERROR: Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 3/18/2024. (Khabbaz, D.) Modified on 2/5/2024 to reflect error, entered in incorrect case (Reis, Julia).
January 29, 2024 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Alfredo Porta. (Faxon, Joel)
January 25, 2024 Filing 28 RESPONSE re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc.. (Powell, Sean)
January 25, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J. Powell on behalf of Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc., Michael Laczkowski (Powell, Sean)
January 18, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Ginder on behalf of Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., TPG Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ginder, Cameron)
January 12, 2024 Filing 25 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephonic Motion Hearing/Status Conference held on 1/12/2024; granting #17 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion for Remand and Conditional Transfer Order filed by Exactech U.S., Inc., Michael Laczkowski, Exactech, Inc.; Stay does not apply to the briefing schedule for Motion for Remand. 13 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Lewis, D)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND ORDER. In accordance with today's status conference, the Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion to stay deadlines pending resolution of the motion to remand and/or conditional transfer order, with the understanding that the stay does not apply to the parties' briefing of the motion to remand. The Court will take under advisement the motion to remand in hopes of ruling on the motion as soon as it can, although it cannot promise at this time that its ruling will issue before action taken by the JPML. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/12/2024. (Parker, B.)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cameron Ginder. Affidavit submitted as #21 . Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/12/2024. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2024. (Chartier, A.)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean J. Powell. Signed by Clerk on 1/12/2024. (Chartier, A.)
January 11, 2024 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT Declaration Signed By Cameron Ginder filed by Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., TPG Inc.. (Kurzman, Marc)
January 11, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Cameron Ginder to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7611098) by Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., TPG Inc.. (Kurzman, Marc)
January 11, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sean J. Powell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7611083) by Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc., Michael Laczkowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Sean J. Powell, Esq.), #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mohan, Catherine)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/12/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. Parties are instructed to call 877-402-9753; Access Code 8576007#. (Lewis, D)
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion for Remand and Conditional Transfer Order by Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc., Michael Laczkowski.Responses due by 1/30/2024 (Mohan, Catherine)
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., TPG Inc.. (Kurzman, Marc)
January 9, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/16/2024 (Lewis, D)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Kurzman on behalf of Osteon Holdings, Inc., Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc., Osteon Merger Sub, Inc., TPG Inc. (Kurzman, Marc)
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Michael Laczkowski (Mohan, Catherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement by Exactech U.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Osteon Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TPG, Inc., Corporate Parent Exactech, Inc. for Exactech U.S., Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement by Exactech, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Osteon Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TPG, Inc. for Exactech, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Exactech U.S., Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Exactech, Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #8 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2024. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Chartier, A.)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alfredo Porta.Responses due by 1/25/2024 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Faxon, Joel)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany S. Cates on behalf of Alfredo Porta (Cates, Brittany)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thomas Faxon on behalf of Alfredo Porta (Faxon, Joel)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/3/2024.(Chartier, A.)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/3/2024.(Chartier, A.)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2024 Discovery due by 7/4/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 8/8/2024 Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2024.(Chartier, A.)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/3/2024.(Perez, J.)
January 3, 2024 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Freberg, B)
January 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc. from Superior Court J.D. of Fairfiled at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV24-6129554-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-7600954, filed by Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Compl, summons, Notice of Service), #2 Exhibit B (TPG Consent), #3 Exhibit C (Laczkowski Declaration), #4 Exhibit D (State Court Notice of Removal))(Mohan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porta v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Porta
Represented By: Brittany S. Cates
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Sean J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Sean J. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteon Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Ginder
Represented By: Marc J. Kurzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteon Merger Sub, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Ginder
Represented By: Marc J. Kurzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteon Intermediate Holdings II, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Ginder
Represented By: Marc J. Kurzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Laczkowski
Represented By: Sean J. Powell
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPG Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Ginder
Represented By: Marc J. Kurzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?