Federal Trade Commission et al v. Chase Nissan LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission and State of Connecticut
Defendant: Refaat Soboh individually and as an officer of Chase Nissan LLC, also d/b/a Manchester City Nissan also known as Brian Soboh, Fred Mojica, Chase Nissan LLC a limited liability company, also doing business as Manchester City Nissan, Patrick Dibre individually and as an officer of Chase Nissan LLC, also d/b/a Manchester City Nissan, Brian Soboh, Michael Hamadi, Aiham Alkhatib, Matthew Chmielinski and Freddy Mojica
Case Number: 3:2024cv00012
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission Notice of Errata (Attachments: #1 Appendix Signed Amended Complaint, #2 Appendix Redline)(Jacobson, Samuel)
February 27, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Mezan on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Mezan, Paul)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul Mezan. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2024. (Freberg, B)
February 16, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul Mezan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by State of Connecticut. (Blake, Jonathan)
February 2, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Cauda on behalf of Chase Nissan LLC, Matthew Chmielinski, Patrick Dibre, Michael Hamadi, Fred Mojica, Refaat Soboh (Cauda, Meagan)
February 2, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Shearin on behalf of Chase Nissan LLC, Matthew Chmielinski, Patrick Dibre, Michael Hamadi, Fred Mojica, Refaat Soboh (Shearin, James)
February 2, 2024 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement by Chase Nissan LLC, Matthew Chmielinski, Patrick Dibre, Michael Hamadi, Fred Mojica, Refaat Soboh identifying Corporate Parent SSS Rocks, LLC, Corporate Parent Refaat, LLC for Chase Nissan LLC. (Kaplan, Jonathan)
February 2, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Kaplan on behalf of Chase Nissan LLC, Matthew Chmielinski, Patrick Dibre, Michael Hamadi, Fred Mojica, Refaat Soboh (Kaplan, Jonathan)
February 2, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/18/2024 (DeRubeis, B.)
February 1, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by James John Healy on behalf of Aiham Alkhatib (Healy, James)
February 1, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Murphy on behalf of Aiham Alkhatib (Murphy, Thomas)
January 26, 2024 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Aiham Alkhatib waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024 filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Jacobson, Samuel)
January 26, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Refaat Soboh waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; Fred Mojica waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; Patrick Dibre waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; Michael Hamadi waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; Chase Nissan LLC waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024; Matthew Chmielinski waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024 filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Jacobson, Samuel)
January 19, 2024 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Federal Trade Commission.(Jacobson, Samuel)
January 9, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE by Federal Trade Commission Certificate of Service (Jacobson, Samuel)
January 9, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Smith on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Smith, Edward)
January 9, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Jacobson on behalf of Federal Trade Commission (Jacobson, Samuel)
January 5, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Aiham Alkhatib, Chase Nissan LLC, Matthew Chmielinski, Patrick Dibre, Michael Hamadi, Fred Mojica, Refaat Soboh* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan Blake* *Office of the Attorney General* *165 Capitol Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Freberg, B)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward Smith. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2024. (Freberg, B)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Samuel Jacobson. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2024. (Freberg, B)
January 5, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel Jacobson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) filed by State of Connecticut, #4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Edward Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) filed by State of Connecticut, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by State of Connecticut, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Protective Order, #10 Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by Federal Trade Commission, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by State of Connecticut Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2024.(Freberg, B)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER Re Discovery. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/4/2024.(Freberg, B)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/4/2024.(Freberg, B)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/4/2024.(Freberg, B)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2024 Discovery due by 7/5/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 8/9/2024 Signed by Clerk on 1/4/2024.(Freberg, B)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Nunes on behalf of State of Connecticut (Nunes, Michael)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Blake on behalf of State of Connecticut (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Edward Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by State of Connecticut. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Samuel Jacobson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by State of Connecticut. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/4/24.(Hushin, Z.)
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Judge Janet C. Hall and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
January 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Chase Nissan LLC. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Patrick Dibre. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Michael Hamadi. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Fred Mojica. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Matthew Chmielinski. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Aiham Alkhatib. (Blake, Jonathan)
January 4, 2024 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Refaat Soboh. (Blake, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission et al v. Chase Nissan LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refaat Soboh individually and as an officer of Chase Nissan LLC, also d/b/a Manchester City Nissan also known as Brian Soboh
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Mojica
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Nissan LLC a limited liability company, also doing business as Manchester City Nissan
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dibre individually and as an officer of Chase Nissan LLC, also d/b/a Manchester City Nissan
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Soboh
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hamadi
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aiham Alkhatib
Represented By: James John Healy
Represented By: Thomas J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Chmielinski
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freddy Mojica
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Jonathan A. Kaplan
Represented By: Meagan Cauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Samuel Jacobson
Represented By: Edward Smith
Represented By: Paul Mezan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Connecticut
Represented By: Jonathan Blake
Represented By: Michael Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?