Robertson v. Hartford Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Liane Robertson
Defendant: Hartford Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00039
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Farrish
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2024; Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2024; Joint Trial Brief due by 7/12/2024; Trial Ready Date 8/16/2024; Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/5/2024 at 04:00 PM in Remote Setting before Judge Michael P Shea (Johnson, D.)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. The #14 Scheduling Order is amended as follows:Dispositive Motions are due June 14, 2024. The Joint Trial Memorandum ("JTM") is due July 12, 2024, or 30 days from the Court's ruling on dispositive motions if any are filed, whichever is later. The case will be ready for trial by August 16, 2024, or 60 days after a ruling on a dispositive motion, whichever is later. The deadlines for discovery set forth in the #14 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Rather than an in-person conference, a Telephonic Status Conference will be held on April 5, 2024 at 4:00 p.m.; Chambers will provide the parties with the dial-in information in advance of the call. The parties will file a joint status report by March 29, 2024.In addition, the parties shall follow the instructions in the attached document regarding joint status reports, the JTM, and discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 2/9/2024. (Bassali, David)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 01/11/2024. (Peterson, M)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 01/11/2024. (Peterson, M)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2024. Discovery due by 7/12/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2024. Signed by Clerk on 01/11/2024. (Peterson, M)
January 11, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 1/11/2024. (Oliver, T.)
January 11, 2024 Filing 23 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/11/2024. (Oliver, T.)
January 11, 2024 Filing 22 Case electronically transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-08334. Modified on 1/12/2024 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
January 11, 2024 Judge Michael P Shea and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Transfer Case. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, upon due consideration of the Stipulated Motion and all other papers heretofore filed in this action that: 1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk shall transfer forthwith this action to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut; and 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. ENTERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/11/2024) (tg)
January 11, 2024 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Connecticut.(tg)
January 10, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bennici, Gregory)
January 10, 2024 Filing 19 JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and Upon Stipulation. Document filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Stipulated Transfer of Action to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut).(Bennici, Gregory)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from Wednesday, December 27, 2023, to Wednesday, January 10, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/22/2023) (tg)
December 22, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time from December 27, 2023 to January 10, 2024 to Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Gregory J. Bennici dated December 22, 2023. Document filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bennici, Gregory)
December 22, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hartford Life Insurance Company answer due 1/10/2024. (tg)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from Monday, December 11, 2023, to Wednesday, December 27, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/7/2023) (tg)
December 7, 2023 Filing 15 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time from December 11, 2023 to December 27, 2023 to Plead or Otherwise Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Gregory J. Bennici dated December 7, 2023. Document filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bennici, Gregory)
December 7, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hartford Life Insurance Company answer due 12/27/2023. (tg)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. This action is exempt from initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B)(i). Counsel for the parties believe the following alternative dispute resolution mechanisms may be helpful in resolving this case: Other. The parties are exploring the possibility of engaging in private mediation. This case is not to be tried to a jury. SO ORDERED. Expert Deposition due by 5/16/2024. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2024. Expert Discovery due by 5/16/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/27/2023) (tg)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #12 Letter filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Friday, December 1, 2023, at 10:00 A.M. is CANCELED. The Court will file the Case Management Plan by separate order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/27/2023) (tg)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Gregory J. Bennici and Jason A. Newfield dated November 22, 2023 re: Rule 16 Conference. Document filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bennici, Gregory)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Hartford Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/10/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. Document filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc., Other Affiliate Hartford Holdings, Inc. for Hartford Life Insurance Company. Document filed by Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael)
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory James Bennici on behalf of Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bennici, Gregory)
November 22, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael H Bernstein on behalf of Hartford Life Insurance Company..(Bernstein, Michael)
September 22, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/1/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/22/2023) (tg)
September 21, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hartford Life Insurance Company..(jgo)
September 21, 2023 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
September 21, 2023 Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
September 21, 2023 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
September 20, 2023 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hartford Life Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Liane Robertson..(Newfield, Jason)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Corey Frankel on behalf of Liane Robertson..(Frankel, Justin)
September 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A. Newfield on behalf of Liane Robertson..(Newfield, Jason)
September 20, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Newfield, Jason)
September 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28316651)Document filed by Liane Robertson..(Newfield, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Hartford Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liane Robertson
Represented By: Justin C. Frankel
Represented By: Jason A. Newfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael H. Bernstein
Represented By: Gregory J. Bennici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?